EP3963865 - LIST-BASED REDUNDANCY CONTROL IN CROWD-BASED IOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states ORANGE 111 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSAN MOHAMMED, Ayman Mostafa Orange Labs Egypt, 3'rd Floor B137 FRA Building, Smart Village 28'th km -Cairo-Alex Road CAIRO, 12577 / EG | 02 /
KOUNTOURIS, Apostolos ORANGE - TGI/OLR/IPL/PATENTS, ORANGE GARDENS 44 avenue de la République - CS 50010 92326 CHATILLON CEDEX / FR | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20720839.8 | 29.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020EP61845 | Priority number, date | EP20190305559 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19305559 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020221787 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963865 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L67/288, H04L67/562 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (US);
G16Y30/00 (US);
G16Y40/10 (US);
H04L67/288 (EP);
H04L67/289 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | LISTENBASIERTE REDUNDANZSTEUERUNG IN CROWD-BASIERTEM IOT | [2022/10] | English: | LIST-BASED REDUNDANCY CONTROL IN CROWD-BASED IOT | [2022/10] | French: | CONTRÔLE DE REDONDANCE REPOSANT SUR DES LISTES DANS L'IOT BASÉ SUR LA FOULE | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/10] | COMMANDE DE REDONDANCE BASÉE SUR UNE LISTE DANS L'IOT BASÉ SUR LA FOULE | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 27.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2829849 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0048]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2018109941 (JAIN PUNEET [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4 ** paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0122]; figure 8 * |