EP3969704 - FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZAPFEL, Andreas Haldenweg 44 6900 Bregenz / AT | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20720896.8 | 15.04.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020AT60153 | Priority number, date | AT20190050452 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: AT 504522019 | [2022/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020232485 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969704 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3969704 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/40, E05F1/10 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
E05D15/40 (EP);
E05F1/1058 (EP,AT,US);
E05D15/401 (EP);
E05F1/1041 (EP);
E05F1/105 (EP);
E05F1/1261 (AT,US);
E05F1/14 (US);
E05F3/22 (US);
E05Y2201/25 (EP);
E05Y2201/499 (EP);
E05Y2201/696 (EP);
E05Y2600/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖBELANTRIEB | [2022/12] | English: | FURNITURE DRIVE | [2022/12] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MEUBLE | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24177830.7 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010006346 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al); | [AD]WO2014134642 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [AD]CN106175199 (WU ZHIYONG); | [AD]WO2018192819 (HETTICH ONI GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | WO2014134642 | CN106175199 | CN107461100 | WO2018192819 |