EP3947670 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES, COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS FOR POLYPEPTIDE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellia Therapeutics, Inc. 40 Erie Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Bradley Andrew 40 Erie Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
DOMBROWSKI, Christian 40 Erie Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
ALEXANDER, Seth C. 40 Erie Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MURRAY, Bradley Andrew Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
02 /
DOMBROWSKI, Christian Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | |||
03 /
ALEXANDER, Seth C. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Eyre, David Edward, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Eyre, David Edward, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20721030.3 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25372 | Priority number, date | US201962825656P | 28.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825656 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020198641 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3947670 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, A61K48/00, C12P19/34, C12N15/67 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/85 (EP,CN,IL);
C12N15/88 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/90 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C12N15/907 (US);
C12P19/34 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | 15.10.2021 | ME | 15.10.2021 | Validation states | KH | 15.10.2021 | MA | 15.10.2021 | MD | 15.10.2021 | TN | 15.10.2021 | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTIDE, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR EXPRESSION VON POLYPEPTIDEN | [2022/06] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDES, COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS FOR POLYPEPTIDE EXPRESSION | [2022/06] | French: | POLYNUCLÉOTIDES, COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'EXPRESSION DE POLYPEPTIDES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 15.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 27.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO2008000632 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * the whole document * * In particular Figures 5a and 5b. * [Y] 5,14,15,23,40; | [YA]WO2017127750 (MODERNATX INC [US]) [Y] 5,14,15,23,40 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4,7-13,16-22,24-39,41-81; | [A]WO2017216392 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * page 3; figure 10 * * page 26 *; | [AP]WO2019067910 (INTELLIA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [AP] 1,2,4,5,7-81* the whole document *; | [A] - GAMBLE CAITLIN E ET AL, "Adjacent Codons Act in Concert to Modulate Translation Efficiency in Yeast", CELL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160630), vol. 166, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2016.05.070, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 679 - 690, XP029667813 [A] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2016.05.070 | [A] - KATHRIN ESCHKE ET AL, "Attenuation of a very virulent Marek's disease herpesvirus (MDV) by codon pair bias deoptimization", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20180129), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1006857, page e1006857, XP055712777 [A] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * the whole document * * In particular page 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1006857 | [YA] - ANDREAS THESS ET AL, "Sequence-engineered mRNA Without Chemical Nucleoside Modifications Enables an Effective Protein Therapy in Large Animals", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, US, (20150608), vol. 23, no. 9, doi:10.1038/mt.2015.103, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 1456 - 1464, XP055316910 [Y] 5,14,15,23 * page 1462, column r * [A] 1,2,4,7-13,16-22,24-81 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2015.103 | [A] - SRIRAM VAIDYANATHAN ET AL, "Uridine Depletion and Chemical Modification Increase Cas9 mRNA Activity and Reduce Immunogenicity without HPLC Purification", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, US, (20180630), vol. 12, doi:10.1016/j.omtn.2018.06.010, ISSN 2162-2531, pages 530 - 542, XP055531206 [A] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.omtn.2018.06.010 | [A] - KARIKÓ KATALIN ET AL, "Incorporation of pseudouridine into mRNA yields superior nonimmunogenic vector with increased translational capacity and biological stability", MOLECULAR THERAPY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 16, no. 11, doi:10.1038/MT.2008.200, ISSN 1525-0024, (20081101), pages 1833 - 1840, (20080916), XP002598556 [A] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2008.200 | [A] - TATS AGE ET AL, "Preferred and avoided codon pairs in three domains of life", BMC GENOMICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, (20081008), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2164-9-463, ISSN 1471-2164, page 463, XP021042201 [A] 1,2,4,5,7-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2164-9-463 | by applicant | WO9313121 | US5378825 | WO9532305 | US5585481 | WO2006007712 | US2014186958 | WO2014136086 | US8889356 | US9023649 | US2015166980 | WO2015089406 | WO2015095340 | WO2016010840 | US2016304846 | US2016312198 | US2016312199 | WO2017053297 | WO2017173054 | WO2018067447 | - J. MILTON HARRIS, Poly(ethylene glycol) chemistry: biotechnical and biomedical applications, (19920000), vol. 5-36 | - VESTERWENGEL, Biochemistry, (20040000), vol. 43, no. 42, pages 13233 - 41 | - ZETSCHE et al., Cell, (20150000), vol. 163, pages 1 - 13 | - MAKAROVA et al., Nat Rev Microbiol, (20150000), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 722 - 36 | - SHMAKOV et al., Molecular Cell, (20150000), vol. 60, pages 385 - 397 | - DITTMAR KA, PLos Genetics, (20060000), vol. 2, no. 12, page e221 | - MAKAROVA et al., N . REV. MICROBIOL., (20110000), vol. 9, pages 467 - 477 | - MAKAROVA et al., NAT. REV. MICROBIOL, (20150000), vol. 13, pages 722 - 36 | - SHMAKOV et al., MOLECULAR CELL, (20150000), vol. 60, pages 385 - 397 | - ZETSCHE et al., Cell, (20151022), vol. 163, no. 3, pages 759 - 771 | - HUBER et al., J. Cell Bio., (20020000), vol. 156, pages 467 - 479 | - QI et al., "Repurposing CRISPR as an RNA-guided platform for sequence-specific control of gene expression", Cell, (20130000), vol. 152, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.02.022, pages 1173 - 83, XP055346792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.02.022 | - PEREZ-PINERA et al., "RNA-guided gene activation by CRISPR-Cas9-based transcription factors", Nat. Methods, (20130000), vol. 10, doi:10.1038/nmeth.2600, pages 973 - 6, XP055181249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2600 | - MALI et al., "CAS9 transcriptional activators for target specificity screening and paired nickases for cooperative genome engineering", Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, doi:10.1038/nbt.2675, pages 833 - 8, XP055294730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2675 | - GILBERT et al., "CRISPR-mediated modular RNA-guided regulation of transcription in eukaryotes", Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044, pages 442 - 51, XP055115843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044 | - KATIBAH et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 33, pages 12025 - 30 | - ABBAS et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20170000), vol. 114, no. 11, pages E2106 - E2115 | - STEPINSKI et al., "Synthesis and properties of mRNAs containing the novel 'anti-reverse' cap analogs 7-methyl(3'-O-methyl)GpppG and 7-methyl(3'deoxy)GpppG", RNA, (20010000), vol. 7, pages 1486 - 1495, XP002466762 | - GUO, P.MOSS, B., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 4023 - 4027 | - MAO, X.SHUMAN, S., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 24472 - 24479 | - ISHIKAWA et al., Nucl. Acids. Symp. Ser., (20090000), no. 53, pages 129 - 130 | - MAIER, M.A. et al., "Biodegradable Lipids Enabling Rapidly Eliminated Lipid Nanoparticles for Systemic Delivery of RNAi Therapeutics", Mol. Ther., (20130000), vol. 21, no. 8, doi:10.1038/mt.2013.124, pages 1570 - 78, XP055237159 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2013.124 | - ROMBERG et al., Pharmaceutical Research, (20080000), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 55 - 71 | - HOEKSTRA et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20040000), vol. 1660, pages 41 - 52 | - SCHMIDT et al., Nature Methods, (20070000), vol. 4, pages 1051 - 1057 | - MEFFERD et al., RNA, (20150000), vol. 21, pages 1683 - 9 | - SCHERER et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20070000), vol. 35, pages 2620 - 2628 |