EP3958865 - 4H-PYRROLO[3,2-C]PYRIDIN-4-ONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02215 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEGEL, Franziska 7 Maple Ave. Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
KORR, Daniel An den Eldenaer Höfen 49 10247 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHRÖDER, Jens Chausseestrasse 50b 10115 Berlin / DE | 04 /
SIEGEL, Stephan Aschaffenburger Str. 6 10779 Berlin / DE | 05 /
GREULICH, Heidi c/o The Broad Institute Inc 415 Main Street Cambridge, Massachusetts, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
KAPLAN, Bethany c/o The Broad Institute Inc 415 Main Street Cambridge, Massachusetts, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
MEYERSON, Matthew c/o Dana Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 20721193.9 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020EP61167 | Priority number, date | US201962838104P | 24.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962838104 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216774 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958865 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/444, A61K31/4545, A61K31/5377, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, G01N33/50, C07D471/04 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K38/179 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/106 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | 4H-PYRROLO[3,2-C]PYRIDIN-4-ON-DERIVATE | [2022/09] | English: | 4H-PYRROLO[3,2-C]PYRIDIN-4-ONE DERIVATIVES | [2022/09] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 4H-PYRROLO[3,2-C]PYRIDIN-4-ONE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 24.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2016120196 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE]) [AD] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016185333 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-27 * Summary of the invention; p. 3, 4th par. to p. 4, 3rd par.; claim 2 *; | [XP]WO2019081486 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [XP] 5,6,12-17* examples, claims * | by applicant | US3966781 | US5011472 | US2004122237 | US2006122168 | WO2009020990 | US2009253767 | EP2151431 | WO2010042699 | WO2012112363 | WO2015022073 | WO2015193339 | WO2016091845 | WO2016100166 | WO2016120196 | - "Isotopic Compositions of the Elements 1997", Pure Appl. Chem., (19980000), vol. 70, no. 1, pages 217 - 235 | - H. J. LEIS et al., Curr. Org. Chem., (19980000), vol. 2, page 131 | - ESAKI et al., Tetrahedron, (20060000), vol. 62, page 10954 | - ESAKI et al., Chem. Eur. J., (20070000), vol. 13, page 4052 | - J. R. MORANDI et al., J. Org. Chem., (19690000), vol. 34, no. 6, page 1889 | - N. H. KHAN, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19520000), vol. 74, no. 12, page 3018 | - S. CHANDRASEKHAR et al., Tetrahedron, (20110000), vol. 52, page 3865 | - HANZLIK et al., J. Org. Chem., (19900000), vol. 55, pages 3992 - 3997 | - R. P. HANZLIK et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19890000), vol. 160, page 844 | - P. J. REIDER et al., J. Org. Chem., (19870000), vol. 52, pages 3326 - 3334 | - M. JARMAN et al., Carcinogenesis, (19930000), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 683 - 688 | - J. ATZRODT et al., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20070000), vol. 46, page 7744 | - K. MATOISHI et al., J. Chem. Soc, Chem. Commun., (20000000), pages 1519 - 1520 | - A. STREITWIESER et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19630000), vol. 85, page 2759 | - C. L. PERRIN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070000), vol. 129, page 4490 | - C. L. PERRIN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20030000), vol. 125, page 15008 | - C. L. PERRIN, Advances in Physical Organic Chemistry, vol. 44, page 144 | - C. L. PERRIN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20050000), vol. 127, page 9641 | - B. TESTA et al., Int. J. Pharm., (19840000), vol. 19, no. 3, page 271 | - D. J. KUSHNER et al., Can. J. Physiol. Pharmacol., (19990000), vol. 77, page 79 | - A. E. MUTLIB et al., Toxicol. Appl. Pharmacol., (20000000), vol. 169, page 102 | - A. M. SHARMA et al., Chem. Res.Toxicol., (20130000), vol. 26, page 410 | - UETRECHT et al., Chemical Research in Toxicology, (20080000), vol. 21, no. 9, page 1862 | - C. J. WENTHUR et al., J. Med. Chem., (20130000), vol. 56, page 5208 | - F. SCHNEIDER et al., Arzneim. Forsch. Drug. Res., (20060000), vol. 56, page 295 | - F. MALTAIS et al., J. Med. Chem., (20090000), vol. 52, page 7974 | - Pure Appl Chem, (19760000), vol. 45, pages 11 - 30 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. P00533-1 | - D. E. WORRALL, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19400000), vol. 62, page 675 | - VANOTTI et al., J. Med. Chem., (20080000), vol. 51, pages 6631 - 6634 | - GUO, Tetrahedron Letts., (20130000), vol. 54, pages 3233 - 3237 | - WATTERSON et al., J. Med. Chem., (20070000), vol. 50, pages 2647 - 3742 | - BELLALE et al., J. Med. Chem., (20140000), vol. 57, pages 6572 - 6582 | - KLIMESOVA et al., Eur. J. Med. Chem., (19960000), vol. 31, pages 389 - 395 | - LEROY et al., Synth. Commun., (19970000), vol. 27, pages 2905 - 2916 | - LAMATTINA et al., J. Org. Chem., (19810000), vol. 46, pages 4179 - 4182 | - BEUGELMANS et al., Tetrahedron, (19830000), vol. 39, pages 4153 - 4162 | - BULLOCK et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19560000), vol. 78, page 490 | - WANG et al., J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 4021 - 3160 | - RABE, Chem. Ber., (19130000), vol. 46, page 1024 | - DE MUNNO et al., Heterocycles, (19960000), vol. 43, pages 1893 - 1900 | - STOKKER et al., J. Med. Chem., (19810000), vol. 24, pages 115 - 117 | - BERTINI et al., J. Med. Chem., (20050000), vol. 48, pages 1610 - 670 | - WALPOLE et al., J. Med. Chem., (19930000), vol. 36, pages 2362 - 2372 | - KURAMOCHI et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20050000), vol. 13, pages 4022 - 4036 | - MACIAS et al., J. Agric. Food Chem., (20060000), vol. 54, page 9843 | - CHAN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20110000), vol. 133, page 2989 | - NIEMANN et al., J. Am. Chem Soc., (19410000), vol. 63, page 2204 | - SWEENEY et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, page 4348 | - CHONG et al., J. Med. Chem., (20120000), vol. 55, page 10601 | - DEGORCE, Tetrahedron Lett., (20110000), vol. 52, page 6719 | - FAIRHURST et al., Org. Lett., (20050000), vol. 7, page 4697 | - CHASKAR et al., Synth. Commun., (20080000), vol. 38, page 16940 | - AIELLO et al., New Engl. J. Med., (19940000), vol. 331, page 1480 | - PEER et al., Lab. Invest., (19950000), vol. 72, page 638 | - LOPEZ et al., Invest. Opththalmol. Vis. Sci., (19960000), vol. 37, page 855 | - POWELL, M.F., "Compendium of Excipients for Parenteral Formulations", PDA Journal of Pharmaceutical Science & Technology, (19980000), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027 | - STRICKLEY, R.G, "Parenteral Formulations of Small Molecule Therapeutics Marketed in the United States (1999)-Part-1", PDA Journal of Pharmaceutical Science & Technology, (19990000), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 324 - 349 | - NEMA, S. et al., "Excipients and Their Use in Injectable Products", PDA Journal of Pharmaceutical Science & Technology, (19970000), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 166 - 171 | - GOODMANGILMAN et al., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, McGraw-Hill, (19960000), pages 1225 - 1287 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1539076-88-4 |