EP3959358 - SURFACE TREATMENT OF FLAT PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS CONTAINING COLOR MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/09] | SURFACE TREATMENT OF FLAT PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS, COMPRISING COLOUR MEASUREMENTS | ||
[2022/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speira GmbH Aluminiumstraße 1 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENTZIS, Dirk Corneliusweg 18 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 02 /
NITZSCHE, Gernot Im Stiefel 19 53340 Meckenheim / DE | 03 /
ECKHARD, Kathrin 50969 Köln / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/09] | 01 /
ZENTZIS, Dirk Corneliusweg 18 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | ||
02 /
NITZSCHE, Gernot Im Stiefel 19 53340 Meckenheim / DE | |||
03 /
ECKHARD, Kathrin Mühlenstraße 29 53347 Alfter / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20721231.7 | 27.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020EP61619 | Priority number, date | EP20190171086 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19171086 | [2022/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216959 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959358 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3959358 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23G1/12, C23G1/22, C23G1/00, G01N21/89, C23G3/02, G01N21/25 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
C23G1/00 (EP);
G01N21/25 (EP,US);
C23G1/125 (EP,US);
C23G1/22 (EP,US);
C23G3/02 (EP);
G01N21/255 (EP);
G01N2021/8918 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | C23G1/00, C23G1/12, C23G1/22, C23G3/02, G01N21/25, G01N21/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON FLACHPRODUKTEN AUS ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN UMFASSEND FARBMESSUNGEN | [2022/09] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENT OF FLAT PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS CONTAINING COLOR MEASUREMENTS | [2022/23] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DES PRODUITS PLANS D'ALLIAGES D'ALUMINIUM COMPRENANT DES MESURES DE COULEUR | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/09] | SURFACE TREATMENT OF FLAT PRODUCTS MADE OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS, COMPRISING COLOUR MEASUREMENTS | ||
Former [2022/09] | TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DE PRODUITS PLATS COMPOSÉS D'ALLIAGES D'ALUMINIUM COMPRENANT DES MESURES DE COULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 18.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08304273 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 13 * * figures 1-2; example 1; claims 1-2 *; | [X]EP0898163 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13 * column 1, paragraphs 1-4 * * column 3, paragraph 13 - column 4, paragraph 21 * * column 4, paragraph 23 - column 17, paragraph 79; figures 1-11 * * column 17, paragraph 81 - column 19, paragraph 91 * * claims 1-25 *; | [X]CN1427091 (NIPPON BACALAIJINGU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010269854 (BARBIERI PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202012012549U (HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,9-13 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraph 16 - page 5, paragraph 21 * * page 5, paragraph 25 - page 6, paragraph 31; figures 1-3 * * page 6, paragraph 32 - page 8, paragraph 37; examples 1-4; table 1 *; | [Y]EP2623639 (HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,9-13 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraphs 16-21 * * page 5, paragraph 25 - page 6, paragraph 28; figures 1-3 * * page 6, paragraph 29 - page 7, paragraph 34; examples 1-4; table 1 * * claims 1-14 *; | [X]WO2014023283 (PREMIUM AEROTEC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 20, paragraph 2; figures 2-7 * * claims 1-13 *; | [A]KR20140023693 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | JP08304273B | DE202012012549U | EP2623639 | KR20140023693 |