EP4139173 - A WINDSCREEN WIPER DEVICE OF THE FLAT BLADE TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trico Belgium S.A. Avenue Champion 1 6790 Aubange / BE | [2024/24] |
Former [2023/09] | For all designated states Trico Belgium S.A. Avenue Champion 1 6790 Aubange / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLAND, Xavier 304, Route de Luxembourg 6700 ARLON / BE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 20721582.3 | 24.04.2020 | [2023/09] | WO2020EP61539 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021213684 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139173 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4139173 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/40 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B60S1/4087 (EP,US);
B60S1/3848 (US);
B60S1/3429 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEIBENWISCHERVORRICHTUNG MIT FLACHEM BLATT | [2023/09] | English: | A WINDSCREEN WIPER DEVICE OF THE FLAT BLADE TYPE | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE DU TYPE À LAME PLATE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 01.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0566443 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]); | [YA]WO2016119852 (FEDERAL MOGUL SA [BE]); | [XAY]DE102016204243 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [YDA]WO2020020431 (FED MOGUL SA [BE]) | by applicant | WO2020020431 |