EP3953030 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUBSTRATE HANDLING AND PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arrayjet Limited Midlothian Innovation Centre Pentlandfield Roslin Midlothian EH25 9RE / GB | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCWILLIAM, Iain Stuart Arrayjet Limited Stobo House Midlothian Innovation Centre Pentlandfield Midlothian Lothian EH25 9RE / GB | 02 /
CHONGKWAN, Marisa Arrayjet Limited Stobo House Midlothian Innovation Centre Pentlandfield Midlothian Lothian EH25 9RE / GB | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20721687.0 | 14.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020GB50945 | Priority number, date | GB20190005181 | 11.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905181 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020208377 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953030 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C40B50/14, C40B60/14, G01N35/02, G01N35/04, G01N35/10, G01N33/543 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
G01N35/10 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP);
B01J2219/00378 (EP);
B01J2219/00527 (EP);
B01J2219/00659 (EP);
B01J2219/00693 (EP);
B01J2219/00725 (EP);
B01J2219/0074 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG UND ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON SUBSTRATEN | [2022/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUBSTRATE HANDLING AND PRINTING | [2022/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA MANIPULATION ET L'IMPRESSION DE SUBSTRATS | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4956648 (HONGO YUTAKA [JP]) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0149414 (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0175166 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-13* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0224325 (PICOLITER INC [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 24; claims 1-98 *; | [Y]WO03058193 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 2 * * page 7, line 33 - page 9, line 2; examples 5, 6, 10; claims 1-29 *; | [Y]US2003198967 (MATSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004014102 (CHEN SHIPING [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2004028683 (ARRAYJET LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2004073988 (ARRAYJET LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * the whole document * * page 3, line 24 - page 7, line 14; claims 1-23, 48-52 * * page 23, line 1 - page 33, line 17; figures 1-9 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 22; claims 26-33 * [A] 7 [I] 11; | [Y]US2005019843 (CHEN DANIEL SHIN-YU [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0019] , [0 56]; figures 1-14; claims 1-50 *; | [Y]WO2008015645 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008116471 (TOXISPOT AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2010248994 (GALE BRUCE K [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 25] - [0043]; figures 1A - 6; examples 3-9; claims 1-35 * [A] 7 [I] 11; | [Y]WO2010124734 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2017038380 (TAO NONGJIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0211889 | WO2004028683 |