EP3945917 - SOLE STRUCTURE FOR ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPOS II, Fidencio c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Wesley, K. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2023/43] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CAMPOS II, Fidencio Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | ||
02 /
CHAN, Wesley, K. Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20721893.4 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25203 | Priority number, date | US201962825098P | 28.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825098 P | US202016825363 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: US202016825363 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198580 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945917 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3945917 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/00, A43B7/14, A43B13/12, A43B13/18, A43B13/20, B29D35/12 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A43B1/0072 (EP,CN);
A43B13/206 (EP,CN,US);
A43B13/04 (EP,CN);
A43B13/122 (EP,CN);
A43B13/127 (EP,CN);
A43B13/188 (EP,CN);
A43B13/189 (EP,CN);
A43B13/20 (EP,CN);
A43B21/28 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SOHLENSTRUKTUR FÜR SCHUHWERK | [2022/06] | English: | SOLE STRUCTURE FOR ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR | [2022/06] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SEMELLE POUR ARTICLE CHAUSSANT | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 21.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23202986.8 / EP4286147 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4817304 (PARKER MARK G [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-19 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 15 - line 56 * [A] 10,20; | [XA]EP1109468 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD [US]) [X] 1-9,11-19 * figures 14-16 * * paragraph [0067] * [A] 10,20; | [XA]KR20020014022 (PARK SUNG SIK [KR]) [X] 1-9,11,13-19 * pages 2, 4 * * abstract * [A] 10,20; | [XA]US2006086003 (TSENG YU-SHENG [TW]) [X] 1-9,11-19 * figures 1- 3 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * [A] 10,20; | [XY]KR20120130542 (CHUN-SIK CHEON) [X] 1-9,11-19 * the whole document * * figure - * [Y] 10,20; | [A]US2015272271 (CAMPOS II FIDENCIO [US], et al) [A] 10,20* figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US10149513 (ELDEM CAN [US], et al) [Y] 10,20 * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | US5713141 | US5952065 | US6582786 |