blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3949658

EP3949658 - METHODS FOR WIDEBAND UNLICENSED CHANNEL ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2025
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.04.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.01.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.10.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[2023/10]
Former [2022/06]For all designated states
IDAC Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway
Suite 300
Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TOOHER, J. Patrick
1000 Sherbrooke Street West
10th Floor
Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA
02 / OTERI, Oghenekome
8488 Lower Scarborough Lane
San Diego, California 92127 / US
03 / EL HAMSS, Aata
1000 Sherbrooke Street West
10th Floor
Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2022/06]01 / TOOHER, J. Patrick
Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA
02 / OTERI, Oghenekome
San Diego, California 92127 / US
03 / EL HAMSS, Aata
Montreal, Québec H3A 3G4 / CA
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2022/06]
Application number, filing date20721905.627.03.2020
[2022/06]
WO2020US25327
Priority number, dateUS201962824799P27.03.2019         Original published format: US 201962824799 P
[2022/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020198623
Date:01.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3949658
Date:09.02.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04W74/0808
[2024/15]
CPC:
H04W74/0808 (EP,CN,KR,US); H04L5/0007 (CN,US); H04L5/0051 (CN,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,KR); H04W74/004 (CN,KR)
Former IPC [2022/06]H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR UNLIZENZIERTEN BREITBANDKANALZUGRIFF[2022/06]
English:METHODS FOR WIDEBAND UNLICENSED CHANNEL ACCESS[2022/06]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ACCÈS À UN CANAL SANS LICENCE À LARGE BANDE[2022/06]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2021National basic fee paid 
22.09.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2021Examination requested  [2022/06]
22.09.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.01.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.08.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2025Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.