Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022168704 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26033 | 31.03.2020 | US202062961024 | 14.01.2020 | US201962827332 | 01.04.2019 | US202017594074 | 31.03.2020 | US202062961038 | 14.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022526394 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26033 | 31.03.2020 | US202062961024 | 14.01.2020 | US201962827332 | 01.04.2019 | US202062961038 | 14.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114302768 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26033 | 31.03.2020 | US202062961024 | 14.01.2020 | US201962827332 | 01.04.2019 | US202062961038 | 14.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3946721 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US26033 | 31.03.2020 | US202062961024 | 14.01.2020 | US201962827332 | 01.04.2019 | US202062961038 | 14.01.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020205895 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062961024 | 14.01.2020 | US201962827332 | 01.04.2019 | US202062961038 | 14.01.2020 |