EP3737097 - METHOD FOR CODING IMAGE ON BASIS OF INTRA PREDICTION USING MPM LIST AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/02] |
Former [2020/46] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 150-721 Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Jaehyun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LI, Ling IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
HEO, Jin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Jangwon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Seunghwan IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/41] |
Former [2020/46] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20722991.5 | 23.03.2020 | [2020/46] | WO2020KR03921 | Priority number, date | US201962822874P | 23.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962822874 P | [2020/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020197203 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737097 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737097 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/11, H04N19/105, H04N19/593, H04N19/70, H04N19/176, H04N19/159 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP,BR,CN);
H04N19/593 (EP,BR,CN,KR);
H04N19/105 (BR,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/157 (KR);
H04N19/159 (EP,BR,CN,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | H04N19/11, H04N19/105, H04N19/593, H04N19/70, H04N19/176 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG AUF GRUNDLAGE EINER INTRAPRÄDIKTION ANHAND EINER MPM-LISTE | [2020/46] | English: | METHOD FOR CODING IMAGE ON BASIS OF INTRA PREDICTION USING MPM LIST AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2020/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE SUR LA BASE D'UNE PRÉDICTION INTRA UTILISANT UNE LISTE MPM ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2020 | Translation filed | 12.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 22.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23217416.9 / EP4319159 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2016373782 (ZHAO XIN [US], et al); | International search | [A]KR20180008797 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [YA]KR101822474B ; | [A]US2018332284 (LIU SHAN [US], et al); | [A]KR20180123674 (KT CORP [KR]); |