EP3963954 - PROVIDING MEASUREMENT CAPABILITIES TO A NETWORK NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEYEB, Oumer Huvudstagatan 3 D 171 44 Solna / SE | 02 /
RUGELAND, Patrik Vingårdsgatan 5 117 58 Stockholm / SE | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20724221.5 | 01.05.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020IB54154 | Priority number, date | US201962842097P | 02.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962842097 P | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222199 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963954 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/27, H04W88/06, H04W24/10, H04W36/24 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/1215 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04W36/0058 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON MESSKAPAZITÄTEN AN EINEN NETZWERKKNOTEN | [2022/10] | English: | PROVIDING MEASUREMENT CAPABILITIES TO A NETWORK NODE | [2022/10] | French: | FOURNITURE DE CAPACITÉS DE MESURE À UN NOEUD DE RÉSEAU | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 23.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |