EP3966285 - A POLYAMIDE COMPOSITION AND A TUBULAR OR PIPE MULTILAYER STRUCTURE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYSAMI, Mohammad 450 Clark Drive Budd Lake, New Jersey 07828 / US | 02 /
HABRAKEN, Gijsbrecht Jacobus Maria Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
HANLEY, Stephen 450 Clark Drive Budd Lake, New Jersey 07828 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20724438.5 | 04.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP62243 | Priority number, date | US201962844803P | 08.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962844803 P | EP20190177559 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19177559 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225176 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966285 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/08 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C08G69/36 (EP,KR);
C08L77/08 (EP,KR);
C08L77/02 (US);
B32B1/08 (KR);
B32B27/34 (KR);
C08G69/34 (EP,KR);
C08L77/06 (KR);
F16L11/04 (US);
B32B2597/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/08, C08K5/435, C08L23/0869, C08L51/06, C08L77/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | POLYAMIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SCHLAUCH- ODER ROHRFÖRMIGE MEHRSCHICHTIGE STRUKTUR DAMIT | [2022/11] | English: | A POLYAMIDE COMPOSITION AND A TUBULAR OR PIPE MULTILAYER STRUCTURE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2022/11] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYAMIDE ET STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE DE TUYAU OU TUBULAIRE COMPRENANT CELLE-CI | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 08.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US6060562 (GUAITA CESARE [IT], et al) [YD] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]US2003232962 (SCHOLL STEVEN L [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0002] , [0011]; example 1 * | by applicant | US5256460 | EP0436923 | US6060562 | US2003232962 | US2008070023 | US8153215 | US2014323631 | US2015247025 | US2018282496 |