EP3967004 - SENSOR HUB, SENSOR SYSTEM, METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SENSOR SIGNALS AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEGO-Holding GmbH Kolpingstrasse 21 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGOLD, Elmar Birkenweg 5 73485 Zöbingen, Unterschneidheim / DE | 02 /
WITSCH, Peter Hauffstr. 30 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 03 /
HAMSIC, Nedzad Am Schneiderlessee 28 74638 Waldenburg / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Kilchert, Jochen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20724499.7 | 07.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP62687 | Priority number, date | DE201910112230 | 10.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019112230 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020229292 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967004 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L12/46 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
G05B19/054 (US);
H04L12/40013 (EP,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP);
H04L2012/4026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | SENSORHUB, SENSORSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON SENSORSIGNALEN UND COMPUTERLESBARES-SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/11] | English: | SENSOR HUB, SENSOR SYSTEM, METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SENSOR SIGNALS AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/11] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR DE CAPTEURS, SYSTÈME DE CAPTEURS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX DE CAPTEURS ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 07.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/28] | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017264455 (OZAKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0219] - paragraph [0237] *; | [Y]US2018234301 (OZAKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0123] ** paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0160] *; | [Y]US2019043341 (WOUHAYBI RITA H [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0049] * * abstract * |