EP3956387 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING UV WEATHERABILITY OF THERMOPLASTIC VULCANIZATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Oscar, O. 4411 Orange Leaf Court Houston, TX 77059 / US | 02 /
JOURDAIN, Eric, P. Avenue Simonne 22 1640 Rhode Saint Genese / BE | 03 /
KENENS, Leander, M. Bergstraat 170 Kessel-Lo 3010 Vlaams Brabant / BE | 04 /
HOLZ, Hermann, J. Franziskusstr. 13 41468 Nuess / DE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 20724676.0 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020US28774 | Priority number, date | US201962835080P | 17.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835080 P | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020214958 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956387 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/24, C08L21/00, C08L23/12 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (EP);
C08L21/00 (EP);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US);
C08J2407/00 (EP,US);
C08J2423/12 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K5/13 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER UV-WETTERBESTÄNDIGKEIT VON THERMOPLASTISCHEN VULKANISATEN | [2022/08] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING UV WEATHERABILITY OF THERMOPLASTIC VULCANIZATES | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA RÉSISTANCE AUX INTEMPÉRIES ET AUX UV DE VULCANISATS THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 09.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1433812 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [A] 1-23* paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US8470922 (JACOB SUNNY [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 19, line 4 - line 13 *; | [A]EP2690136 (LANXESS ELASTOMERS BV [NL]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0095] * | by applicant | US4130535 | US4311628 | US4383913 | US4543399 | US4588790 | US4594390 | US5001205 | US5028670 | US5100947 | US5157081 | US5317036 | US5352749 | US5405922 | US5436304 | US5453471 | US5462999 | WO9633227 | US5616661 | US5627242 | WO9722639 | US5665818 | EP0794200 | US5668228 | EP0634421 | US5677375 | EP0802202 | US5907004 | US6051681 | US6147160 | US6261441 | US6451915 | US7615589 | US7622528 | US7655727 | US7935763 | US7964672 | US8207279 | US8653197 | US8709315 | US9399709 | US10196508 | US10240008 | - KGK-Kautschuk und Gummi Kunststoffe,, (20010000), vol. 54, no. 6, pages 321 - 326 |