EP3965994 - ROLLER BURNISHING TOOL FOR TREATING A WORKPIECE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gühring KG Herderstrasse 50-54 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKEL, Gerd Falkenweg 5 90617 Puschendorf / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Gleim, Christian Ragnar Gleim Petri Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Mergentheimer Straße 36 97082 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Gleim, Christian Ragnar Ludwigstraße 22 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20724741.2 | 27.04.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020DE100340 | Priority number, date | DE201910111784 | 07.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019111784 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020224710 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965994 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B24B39/02 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B24B39/023 (EP,US);
B23P9/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ROLLIERWERKZEUG ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINER WERKSTÜCKOBERFLÄCHE | [2022/11] | English: | ROLLER BURNISHING TOOL FOR TREATING A WORKPIECE SURFACE | [2022/11] | French: | OUTIL DE ROULAGE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE DE PIÈCE À USINER | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |