EP3970263 - TRANSMISSION UNIT AND ASSEMBLY OF A TRANSMISSION UNIT HAVING A TERMINAL BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna PT B.V. & Co. KG Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Strasse 1 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYARI, Nadine Hegelstraße 6 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | 02 /
IHBEN, Harald Hulda-Goes-Weg 21 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20724790.9 | 05.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP62444 | Priority number, date | DE201910207042 | 15.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019207042 | [2022/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020229228 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970263 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/22, H02K5/10, H02K15/14 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H02K5/225 (EP);
H02K15/14 (EP);
H02K5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEEINHEIT SOWIE MONTAGE EINER GETRIEBEEINHEIT MIT KLEMMENBLOCK | [2022/12] | English: | TRANSMISSION UNIT AND ASSEMBLY OF A TRANSMISSION UNIT HAVING A TERMINAL BLOCK | [2022/12] | French: | UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION AINSI QUE MONTAGE D'UNE UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION AVEC BORNIER | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 24.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102011081896 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [YA]DE102016204968 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0013] * [A] 9; | [YA]US2018102686 (BOUARROUDJ LILYA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0064] , [0070] * [A] 9; | [A]DE102018109407 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 3* paragraph [0061] * | by applicant | DE102007024472 | DE112013006946T | WO2016156730 | DE102016113424 |