EP3965828 - EXOSOME COMPRISING STABILIZED RNA THERAPEUTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evox Therapeutics Ltd Oxford Science Park Medawar Centre 2nd Floor East Building Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford OX4 4HG / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Evox Therapeutics Limited Oxford Science Park Medawar Centre 2nd Floor East Building Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 4HG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTILLA LLORENTE, Virginia Oxford Science Park Medawar Centre 2nd Floor East Building Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4HG / GB | 02 /
LIANG, Xiuming Terapivagen 14C, LGH1701 Huddinge 14156 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
ZICKLER, Antje Sveavägen 164L, Apt. L14 11346 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
DE LUCA, Mariacristina 5 Grove Court, Church Way Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4EP / GB | 05 /
ERRICHELLI, Lorenzo 6 Olney Court, Marlborough Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 4LZ / GB | 06 /
SMITH, Christopher 5 Grove Court, Church Way Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4EP / GB | 07 /
TSALIC, Ran 11 Wellesborne Close Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3UR / GB | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20724828.7 | 07.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP62791 | Priority number, date | GB20190006482 | 08.05.2019 Original published format: GB 201906482 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225392 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965828 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965828 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/69, A61K47/64, C12N15/11, C12N15/88, C07K14/705, A61P43/00, C07K14/47 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A61K47/6901 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61K9/5068 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP);
C07K14/70596 (US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
C07K2319/85 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP);
C12N2320/32 (EP,US);
C12N2800/80 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | A61K47/69, A61K47/64, C12N15/11, C12N15/88, C07K14/705 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXOSOM MIT STABILISIERTEN RNA-THERAPEUTIKA | [2022/11] | English: | EXOSOME COMPRISING STABILIZED RNA THERAPEUTICS | [2022/11] | French: | EXOSOMES COMPRENANT DES AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES À BASE D'ARN STABILISÉS | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 15.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [IDP]WO2019092145 (EVOX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [IDP] 1-29* the whole document *; | [X] - Lysangela R. Alves ET AL, "Extracellular vesicle-mediated RNA release in Histoplasma 2 capsulatum", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/570291, (20190307), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/570291v1.full.pdf, (20200727), XP055718329 [X] 1,7,14-17 * sentences 98,155-157 * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/570291 | [X] - MICHELLE E. HUNG ET AL, "A platform for actively loading cargo RNA to elucidate limiting steps in EV-mediated delivery", JOURNAL OF EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES, (20160101), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.3402/jev.v5.31027, page 31027, XP055711976 [X] 22,23,25,26 * abstract * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3402/jev.v5.31027 | [X] - DHRUVITKUMAR S. SUTARIA ET AL, "Low active loading of cargo into engineered extracellular vesicles results in inefficient miRNA mimic delivery", JOURNAL OF EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES, (20170614), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1080/20013078.2017.1333882, page 1333882, XP055611131 [X] 22,23,25,26 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/20013078.2017.1333882 | [X] - DHRUVITKUMAR S. SUTARIA ET AL, "Achieving the Promise of Therapeutic Extracellular Vesicles: The Devil is in Details of Therapeutic Loading", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, US, (20170317), vol. 34, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s11095-017-2123-5, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1053 - 1066, XP055543423 [X] 22,23,25,26 * page 9, section "Targeted and Modular EV Loading Approach" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-017-2123-5 | by applicant | WO2010119256 | - HUNGLEONARD, Journal of Extracellular Vesicles, (20160000), vol. 5, page 31027 | - TUTUCCI et al., "An improved MS2 system for accurate reporting of the mRNA life cycle", Nat Methods, (20180100), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 81 - 89 | - DEVEREUX et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - ALTSCHUL S. F., J Mol Evol, (19930000), vol. 36, pages 290 - 300 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F et al., J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | WO2017GB51479 | WO2018EP80681 |