EP3973262 - TESTING METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVE TEMPERATURE MEASURING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB SCHWEIZ AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKER, Andreas Evenaristr. 52 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
GEBHARDT, Jörg Rüsselsheimer Allee 28a 55130 Mainz / DE | 03 /
UDE, Peter Spessartstr. 91 63457 Hanau / DE | 04 /
HORSTKOTTE, Jürgen Elsestr. 23 32130 Enger / DE | 05 /
DAAKE, Wilhelm Raderhorster Ellerbruch 41 32469 Petershagen / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20724869.1 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020EP63623 | Priority number, date | EP20190175757 | 21.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19175757 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234156 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973262 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/14, G01K15/00 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G01K15/007 (EP,US);
G01K1/143 (EP,US);
G01K15/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | PRÜFVERFAHREN FÜR NICHTINVASIVE TEMPERATURMESSINSTRUMENTE | [2022/13] | English: | TESTING METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVE TEMPERATURE MEASURING INSTRUMENTS | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESSAI POUR INSTRUMENTS DE MESURE DE TEMPÉRATURE NON INVASIFS | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3759083 (ERICKSON G, et al); | [XYI]JPH07225530 (CANON KK); | [Y]US2002048309 (BLANKENAGEL JOHN A [US]); | [A]JP2009079965 (KIMURA MITSUTERU); | [XYI]EP2729777 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]); | [YDA]DE102015105819 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) | by applicant | DE102015105819 |