EP4143368 - CATHODE BLOCKS FOR ALUMINIUM ELECTROYSIS AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norsk Hydro ASA 0240 Oslo / NO | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDHEIM JENSEN, Morten 3733 Skien / NO | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Hydro IPD Norsk Hydro ASA Intellectual Property P.O. Box 980 Skøyen 0240 Oslo / NO | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 20725638.9 | 30.04.2020 | [2023/10] | WO2020EP62030 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219222 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143368 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4143368 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/08, B32B18/00, C04B35/528, C04B35/626, C04B35/634 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
C25C3/08 (EP);
B32B18/00 (EP);
C04B35/528 (EP);
C04B35/6261 (EP);
C04B35/62685 (EP);
C04B35/63496 (EP);
C04B2235/3813 (EP);
C04B2235/3821 (EP);
C04B2235/3826 (EP);
C04B2235/3839 (EP);
C04B2235/3843 (EP);
C04B2235/422 (EP);
C04B2235/5427 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | C25C3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHODENBLÖCKE FÜR DIE ALUMINIUMELEKTROLYSE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2023/10] | English: | CATHODE BLOCKS FOR ALUMINIUM ELECTROYSIS AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/10] | French: | BLOCS CATHODIQUES POUR LA PRODUCTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE D'ALUMINIUM ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE CEUX-CI | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4466995 (BOXALL LARRY G [US], et al) [Y] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [A]US4624766 (BOXALL LARRY G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6258224 (MIRTCHI AMIR A [CA]) [Y] 6,7,11,15 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE102012201468 (SGL CARBON SE [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,10,11,15 [I] 4; | [AP]WO2019174948 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [AP] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | WO0036187 |