EP3999948 - METHOD FOR DELIVERING PERSONALISED AUDIO CONTENT IN A VEHICLE CAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE-NINDRE, Bénédicte 21, place Saint-Christophe 78117 Châteaufort / FR | 02 /
WORMS, Laurent 108 Boulevard de la Reine 78000 VERSAILLES / FR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. API : TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20725715.5 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP63678 | Priority number, date | FR20190008199 | 19.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1908199 | [2022/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013402 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999948 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06Q30/02 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP);
G06F3/165 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0266 (EP);
H04R3/00 (US);
G01C21/3476 (US);
H04R2499/13 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON PERSONALISIERTEM AUDIOINHALT IN EINER FAHRZEUGKABINE | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD FOR DELIVERING PERSONALISED AUDIO CONTENT IN A VEHICLE CAB | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉLIVRER UN CONTENU AUDIO PERSONNALISÉ DANS UNE CABINE DE VÉHICULE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 12.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016210670 (BENNETT RICHARD [US]); | [XI]US2017255966 (KHOURY JOSEPH [US]); | [A]US2018328755 (BOFFERDING NICHOLAS E [US], et al) |