EP3935918 - SELF-BAKING ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERROGLOBE FRANCE, S.A.S. 517 Avenue de la Boisse 73000 Chambery / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/37] | For all designated states FERROGLOBE FRANCE, S.A.S. 517 avenue de la Boisse 73000 Chamberry / FR | ||
Former [2024/15] | For all designated states FERROPEM 517 avenue de la Boisse 73000 Chambery / FR | ||
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states FERROPEM 517 avenue de la Boisse 73000 Chambery / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOB, Philippe 470 Route du Clos Don Jean 74290 MENTHON-SAINT-BERNARD / FR | 02 /
BERTHOLLET, Damien Saint Sixte 38620 MERLAS / FR | 03 /
MORIN, Pierre-Henri 50 chemin de la Canaud 74000 ANNECY / FR | [2024/15] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
JACOB, Philippe 74290 MENTHON-SAINT-BERNARD / FR | ||
02 /
BERTHOLLET, Damien 38620 MERLAS / FR | |||
03 /
MORIN, Pierre-Henri 74000 ANNECY / FR | Representative(s) | Garcia González, Sergio Bird & Bird International LLP Paseo de la Castellana 7, 7° Planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2024/15] |
Former [2022/02] | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 20725819.5 | 04.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020FR50429 | Priority number, date | FR20190002394 | 08.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1902394 | [2022/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020183093 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935918 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3935918 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/107, H05B7/09 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H05B7/09 (EP,US);
H05B7/107 (EP,US);
F27B3/085 (US);
H05B2203/017 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | 09.09.2021 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTBACKENDE ELEKTRODE | [2022/02] | English: | SELF-BAKING ELECTRODE | [2022/02] | French: | ELECTRODE À AUTO-CUISSON | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR647208 (NORSKE ELEKTROKEMISK IND AS) [Y] 1,8,10 * page 2, line 66 - line 69 *; | [Y]FR2654501 (ELKEM TECHNOLOGY [NO]) [Y] 10 * page 13, line 15 - line 19 *; | [XAY]FR2797739 (INVENSIL [FR]) [X] 9,12,13 * page 3, line 3 - line 12 * * page 2, line 11 - line 32; figure 1 * * page 3, line 28 - line 29 * [A] 2-7,11,14,15 [Y] 1,8,10; | [XP]WO2019233549 (RHEINFELDEN CARBON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1,5,6* figure 1; claims 1,6 * | Examination | FR2797739 | by applicant | US4575856 |