EP3938836 - POLARISATION SEPARATION DEVICE, DIFFERENTIAL INTERFEROMETER AND DIFFERENTIAL OPTICAL CONTRAST MICROSCOPE COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horiba France SAS Passage Jobin Yvon CS 45002 14 Boulevard Thomas Gobert 91120 Palaiseau / FR | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHER, Olivier 18 rue des Chataigniers SUR-YVETTE 91190 / FR | 02 /
RICHARD, Simon 2 avenue de Bellevue 91120 PALAISEAU / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
ACHER, Olivier SUR-YVETTE 91190 / FR | ||
02 /
RICHARD, Simon 91120 PALAISEAU / FR | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20725874.0 | 11.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020FR50500 | Priority number, date | FR20190002638 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1902638 | [2022/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020183107 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3938836 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3938836 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28, G02B27/42, G02B21/14 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G02B27/283 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01J9/02 (US);
G02B21/0092 (CN);
G02B21/14 (EP,KR);
G02B27/286 (CN);
G02B27/4261 (EP,KR);
G02B27/4277 (EP,KR);
G01J2009/0261 (US);
G01J2009/0265 (US);
G01J2009/0269 (US);
G02B26/06 (US);
G02B5/3083 (US);
G02B7/021 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSSEPARATIONSVORRICHTUNG, DIFFERENZINTERFEROMETER UND OPTISCHES DIFFERENZKONTRASTMIKROSKOP MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2022/03] | English: | POLARISATION SEPARATION DEVICE, DIFFERENTIAL INTERFEROMETER AND DIFFERENTIAL OPTICAL CONTRAST MICROSCOPE COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE | [2022/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF SÉPARATEUR DE POLARISATION, INTERFÉROMÈTRE DIFFÉRENTIEL ET MICROSCOPE OPTIQUE À CONTRASTE DIFFÉRENTIEL COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 13.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3351978 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A] - TAO ZHAN ET AL, "Pancharatnam-Berry optical elements for head-up and near-eye displays [Invited]", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA - B., US, (20190222), vol. 36, no. 5, doi:10.1364/JOSAB.36.000D52, ISSN 0740-3224, page D52, XP055590395 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAB.36.000D52 | [A] - ROMAIN LABERDESQUE ET AL, "Tunable angular shearing interferometer based on wedged liquid crystal cells", APPLIED OPTICS, (20171101), vol. 56, no. 31, doi:10.1364/AO.56.008656, ISSN 1559-128X, page 8656, XP055645278 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.56.008656 | [A] - CHOI KIHONG ET AL, "Incoherent digital holography using geometric phase", MICROFLUIDICS, BIOMEMS, AND MEDICAL MICROSYSTEMS XI : 3 - 5 FEBRUARY 2013, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, UNITED STATES ; [PART OF SPIE PHOTONICS WEST]; IN: PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE; ISSN 0277-786X; VOL. 8615; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE; ISSN 0277-786X; VOL. 8615],, (20181115), vol. 10964, doi:10.1117/12.2506481, ISBN 978-1-5106-2099-5, pages 1096461 - 1096461, XP060114475 [A] 1-13 * 2. Principle of GP-SIDH *;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2506481 | by applicant | - KATHRYN J. HORNBURG et al., "Optical Modeling and Performance Prédictions X", SPIE Optical Engineering and Applications, Proceedings, (20180000), vol. 10743, page 1074305 |