EP3955825 - ENDOCAVITY PROBE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING DIAGNOSTIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELESTA S.P.A. Via Baldanzese, 17 50041 Calenzano (FI) / IT | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASOTTI, Leonardo Via Bolognese, 81 - Loc. Montorsoli 50019 Sesto Fiorentino (FI) / IT | 02 /
BRESCHI, Luca Via Rupille, 2 59021 Vaiano (PO) / IT | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20725917.7 | 16.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020IB53593 | Priority number, date | IT20190005986 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: IT201900005986 | IT20190005988 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: IT201900005988 | [2022/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212893 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955825 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61B8/4444 (EP);
A61B8/5261 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP);
A61B8/085 (US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/4488 (EP,US);
A61B8/5246 (US);
A61B8/54 (US);
A61B8/40 (EP);
A61B8/4494 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | ENDOKAVITÄTSSONDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DIAGNOSTISCHEN BILDERN | [2022/08] | English: | ENDOCAVITY PROBE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING DIAGNOSTIC IMAGES | [2022/08] | French: | SONDE ENDOCAVITAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011295123 (FELEPPA ERNEST J [US]); | [A]EP2455133 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [X]US2013310679 (NATARAJAN SHYAM [US], et al) |