EP3972741 - COATING THICKNESS OPTIMIZATION AND PROGRAMMING METHOD FOR A COATING SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING COATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Straße 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKELER, Christoph Hegelstraße 7 71272 Renningen / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20726013.4 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020EP62874 | Priority number, date | DE201910113341 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019113341 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234008 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972741 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B12/00, B25J9/16, G05B17/02 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
B25J9/1664 (EP,KR,US);
B05B12/084 (EP,KR,US);
B05B12/00 (EP);
B05B13/0431 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/1671 (EP,KR);
G05B17/02 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | SCHICHTDICKENOPTIMIERUNGS- UND PROGRAMMIERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BESCHICHTUNGSANLAGE UND ENTSPRECHENDE BESCHICHTUNGSANLAGE | [2022/13] | English: | COATING THICKNESS OPTIMIZATION AND PROGRAMMING METHOD FOR A COATING SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING COATING SYSTEM | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR OPTIMISER ET PROGRAMMER UNE ÉPAISSEUR DE COUCHE POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE REVÊTEMENT ET INSTALLATION DE REVÊTEMENT CORRESPONDANTE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0867233 (BASF CORP [US]); | [A]DE10225276 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]); | by applicant | US5521477 | DE10150826 |