Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12047715 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2024 | B2 | US2021303899 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962837804 | 24.04.2019 | US202117345990 | 11.06.2021 | US202016856475 | 23.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11670098 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2023 | B2 | US2020342247 | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962837804 | 24.04.2019 | US202016856475 | 23.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3162775 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117345990 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3137885 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962837804 | 24.04.2019 | WO2020US29503 | 23.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3959649 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962837804 | 24.04.2019 | WO2020US29503 | 23.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022007223 | 11.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117345990 | 11.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020219664 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962837804 | 24.04.2019 |