EP3962519 - CELLS EXPRESSING A CHIMERIC RECEPTOR FROM A MODIFIED CD247 LOCUS, RELATED POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juno Therapeutics, Inc. 400 Dexter Ave. N, Suite 1200 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURLEIGH, Stephen Michael c/o Juno Therapeutics, Inc. 400 Dexter Ave. N. Suite 1200 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 02 /
NYE, Christopher Heath c/o Juno Therapeutics, Inc. 400 Dexter Ave. N. Suite 1200 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20727074.5 | 30.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020US30875 | Priority number, date | US201962841578P | 01.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962841578 P | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020223571 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962519 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/725, C12N5/0783 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/46 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/48 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464417 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464429 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (KR,US);
C07K14/70521 (KR,US);
C07K14/70578 (KR);
C07K14/7151 (US);
C07K16/2878 (KR);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/625 (US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N15/907 (US);
C12N9/22 (US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/622 (KR);
C07K2319/02 (KR);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL);
C12N2310/20 (US);
C12N2501/51 (KR);
C12N2501/515 (KR);
C12N2501/599 (EP,IL);
C12N2510/00 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | 02.11.2021 | ME | 02.11.2021 | Validation states | KH | 02.11.2021 | MA | 02.11.2021 | MD | 02.11.2021 | TN | 02.11.2021 | Title | German: | ZELLEN, DIE EINEN CHIMÄREN REZEPTOR AUS EINEM MODIFIZIERTEN CD247-LOCUS EXPRIMIEREN, VERWANDTE POLYNUKLEOTIDE UND VERFAHREN | [2022/10] | English: | CELLS EXPRESSING A CHIMERIC RECEPTOR FROM A MODIFIED CD247 LOCUS, RELATED POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND METHODS | [2022/10] | French: | CELLULES EXPRIMANT UN RÉCEPTEUR CHIMÉRIQUE À PARTIR D'UN LOCUS CD247 MODIFIÉ, POLYNUCLÉOTIDES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 02.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2017093969 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | by applicant | US4452773 | US4690915 | US4795698 | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5087616 | WO9208796 | US5200084 | US5219740 | US5323907 | US5356802 | EP0452342 | WO9428143 | WO9519431 | US5436150 | US5487994 | WO9606166 | US5789538 | WO9853058 | WO9853059 | WO9853060 | WO9853057 | WO9854311 | US5925523 | US6007988 | US6013453 | WO0014257 | US6040177 | US6060273 | WO0027878 | US6140081 | US6200759 | US6207453 | WO0160970 | WO0188197 | WO0216536 | US6410319 | US6453242 | US6451995 | US2002131960 | US2002150914 | WO02099084 | US6503717 | WO03016496 | US6534261 | US6599692 | WO03068201 | US2003170238 | US2003223994 | US2003232410 | US6689558 | US2004191260 | US2005026157 | US2005064474 | US2005208489 | US2006034850 | US2006063231 | US7067317 | US7070995 | WO2006099875 | US2007092530 | US2007116690 | US7262054 | US7265209 | US7354762 | US2008159996 | US7446190 | US7446179 | US7446191 | WO2009072003 | WO2009080829 | US2009226474 | US2009304679 | US2010047805 | WO2010033140 | US2010218264 | US2010260748 | US2011003380 | US7888121 | US7914796 | US7951925 | US7972854 | US2011207221 | US8008450 | US2011265198 | US2011301073 | US2012017290 | US8110379 | US8153765 | WO2012092612 | US2012189622 | WO2012129514 | WO2012138927 | US8324353 | US8339645 | EP2537416 | US8389282 | US8398282 | US8409861 | US2013122591 | WO2013071154 | US2013137104 | US2013149337 | US8479118 | US2013177983 | US2013196373 | WO2013123061 | WO2013126726 | US2013287748 | WO2013166321 | US8586526 | US2013326645 | US8603477 | WO2014031687 | WO2014055668 | US8703489 | US2014120622 | US8802374 | WO2014127261 | US2014286987 | US2014294841 | US8911993 | WO2014210064 | US8945868 | US8956828 | US2015056705 | US9005973 | US9045763 | US2015266973 | WO2015142675 | US9150847 | WO2015161276 | US2015335708 | US9200266 | US9233125 | US2016024474 | US2016030477 | US9255250 | WO2016022994 | US2016046700 | WO2016030414 | US2016152723 | WO2016090327 | WO2016090320 | WO2016090329 | WO2016090312 | US2016272999 | US9458205 | US2017016027 | US2017051035 | WO2017093969 | US2017211075 | WO2017193107 | WO1991US08442 | WO1994US05601 |