Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3949241 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202080021916 EP20727694 IB2020000227 US202016832360



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11419184Global Dossier 16.08.2022B2
US2020314960 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US202016832360 27.03.2020
US201962825711 28.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN114041272BGlobal Dossier 13.12.2024B
CN114041272 11.02.2022A
Priority number Date
WO2020IB00227 27.03.2020
US201962825711 28.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3949241Global Dossier 30.04.2025B1
EP3949241 09.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2020IB00227 27.03.2020
US201962825711 28.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020194054Global Dossier 23.12.2021A8
WO2020194054 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962825711 28.03.2019