EP3965582 - METHOD OF REMOVING SPORES FROM RAW GOAT MILK, PROCESS FOR PREPARING PURIFIED GOAT MILK, GOAT MILK ACCORDINGLY PRODUCED AND ITS USE AND CHEESE MAKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/11] | METHOD OF REMOVING SPORES FROM RAW GOAT MILK, PROCESS FOR PREPARING PURIFIED GOAT MILK, GOAT MILK ACCORDINGLY PRODUCED AND ITS USE AND CHEESE MAKING METHOD | ||
[2024/23] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dairy Protein Cooperation Food B.V. Oud-Bodegraafseweg 14 c 2411 HS Bodegraven / NL | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVRIJSEN, Bas Willem Maarten c/o Oud-Bodegraafseweg 14 c 2411 HS Bodegraven / NL | 02 /
BENJAMINS, Frédéric c/o Oud-Bodegraafseweg 14 c 2411 HS Bodegraven / NL | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20727736.9 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020NL50297 | Priority number, date | EP20190173314 | 08.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19173314 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020226501 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965582 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965582 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/142, A01J11/10, A23C3/02, A23C7/04, A23C19/05 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A01J11/10 (EP,CN,US);
A23C19/05 (EP,CN,US);
A23C7/046 (EP,CN,US);
A23C3/02 (EP,CN);
A23C9/1422 (EP,CN,US);
A23C2210/256 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SPORENENTFERNUNG AUS ZIEGENROHMILCH, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEREINIGTER ZIEGENMILCH, ENTSPRECHEND HERGESTELLTE ZIEGENMILCH, SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG UND KÄSEHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD OF REMOVING SPORES FROM RAW GOAT MILK, PROCESS FOR PREPARING PURIFIED GOAT MILK, GOAT MILK ACCORDINGLY PRODUCED AND ITS USE AND CHEESE MAKING METHOD | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE SPORES DE LAIT DE CHÈVRE CRU, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LAIT PURIFIÉ DE CHÈVRE, LAIT AINSI OBTENU ET SON UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FROMAGE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON SPOREN AUS ZIEGENROHMILCH, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEREINIGTER ZIEGENMILCH, DANACH HERGESTELLTE ZIEGENMILCH SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG UND KÄSEHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2022/11] | METHOD OF REMOVING SPORES FROM RAW GOAT MILK, PROCESS FOR PREPARING PURIFIED GOAT MILK, GOAT MILK ACCORDINGLY PRODUCED AND ITS USE AND CHEESE MAKING METHOD | ||
Former [2022/11] | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE RETIRER LES SPORES D'UN LAIT DE CHÈVRE CRU, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LAIT DE CHÈVRE PURIFIÉ, LAIT DE CHÈVRE AINSI PRODUIT ET SON UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FROMAGE | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1825759 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP]); | [A]US2012301591 (FAUQUANT JACQUES [FR], et al); | [XI]US2014308417 (ADACHI YOSHIO [JP]); | by applicant | US2014308417 |