EP3977038 - SIGHTING SYSTEM COMPRISING A SIGHTING DEVICE THAT CAN BE ORIENTED RELATIVE TO A BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/14] | SIGHTING SYSTEM COMPRISING A SIGHTING DEVICE THAT CAN BE ORIENTED RELATIVE TO A BASE, THE SYSTEM BEING CAPABLE OF IMPLEMENTING A SIMPLE AND RAPID ON-SITE CALIBRATION METHOD | ||
[2023/34] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXAIL 34 Rue de la Croix de Fer 78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Ixblue 34 rue de la Croix de Fer 78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALLEE, Guillaume c/o Ixblue 34 rue de la Croix de Fer 78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | 02 /
CREPY, Bruno c/o Ixblue 34 rue de la Croix de Fer 78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20728783.0 | 02.06.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP65237 | Priority number, date | FR20190005836 | 03.06.2019 Original published format: FR 1905836 | [2022/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020245128 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977038 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977038 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/16, F41G3/22, F41G3/02, G01C1/02, G01C15/00, G02B23/14 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G02B23/14 (EP);
G01C15/002 (EP,US);
G01C1/02 (EP,US);
G02B23/16 (US);
F41G3/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | F41G3/16, F41G3/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VISIEREINRICHTUNG MIT EINER RELATIV ZU EINER BASIS AUSRICHTBAREN VISIERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/34] | English: | SIGHTING SYSTEM COMPRISING A SIGHTING DEVICE THAT CAN BE ORIENTED RELATIVE TO A BASE | [2023/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE VISEE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE VISEE ORIENTABLE PAR RAPPORT A UNE EMBASE | [2023/34] |
Former [2022/14] | VISIEREINRICHTUNG MIT EINER RELATIV ZU EINER BASIS AUSRICHTBAREN VISIERVORRICHTUNG, WOBEI DAS SYSTEM IN DER LAGE IST, EIN EINFACHES UND SCHNELLES VOR-ORT-KALIBRIERUNGSVERFAHREN AUSZUFÜHREN | ||
Former [2022/14] | SIGHTING SYSTEM COMPRISING A SIGHTING DEVICE THAT CAN BE ORIENTED RELATIVE TO A BASE, THE SYSTEM BEING CAPABLE OF IMPLEMENTING A SIMPLE AND RAPID ON-SITE CALIBRATION METHOD | ||
Former [2022/14] | SYSTÈME DE VISÉE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE VISÉE ORIENTABLE PAR RAPPORT À UNE EMBASE, APTE À METTRE EN OEUVRE UN PROCÉDÉ DE CALIBRAGE SUR SITE SIMPLE ET RAPIDE | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012212622 (NAKAMURA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [IA]JP2014114973 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0023] - [0025] - [0031] , [0045]; figures 1,4 * [A] 12-15; | [A]US2016223327 (NORMAN WALTER W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0038] - [0040] - [0042] , [0062]; figure 1 * |