EP3977220 - COMPONENT TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICHLER, Christian 80995 München / DE | 02 /
FRENO, Dieter 80995 München / DE | 03 /
HIEBER, Andreas 80995 München / DE | 04 /
FARAH, Philipp 80995 München / DE | 05 /
GASSMANN, Salome 80995 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20728914.1 | 18.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020DE00096 | Priority number, date | DE201910207618 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019207618 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239150 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977220 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977220 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/41805 (EP);
G01M15/14 (US);
G05B19/41875 (EP);
G05B2219/32187 (EP);
G05B2219/32212 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEILPRÜFUNG | [2022/14] | English: | COMPONENT TESTING | [2022/14] | French: | CONTRÔLE DE COMPOSANT | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 22.11.2023 | |
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2993541 (MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2016046729 (BOMBARDIER INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]EP3045992 (HEXAGON TECHNOLOGY CT GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0096]; figures 3,6-9 *; | [A]EP3082004 (MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0060]; figure 1 * |