EP3969654 - DOSING UNIT, WATER-BEARING HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUOGO, Alberto Hull HU8 7DS / GB | 02 /
SCHULTZ, Jakob 81739 München / DE | 03 /
SCHIELE, Alexander 81739 München / DE | 04 /
COLLINGS, Hallam Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DW / GB | 05 /
FLETCHER, Henry Matthew Lawrence Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DW / GB | 06 /
SMITH, Iain Christopher Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DW / GB | 07 /
WHADCOAT, Jon Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DW / GB | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Soellner, Siegfried, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20728949.7 | 06.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP62610 | Priority number, date | GB20190006677 | 13.05.2019 Original published format: GB 201906677 | EP20190173997 | 13.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19173997 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020229269 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969654 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02, A47L15/44 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
D06F39/026 (EP,US);
A47L15/0055 (EP,US);
A47L15/4463 (EP,US);
D06F33/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | DOSIERGERÄT, WASSERFÜHRENDES HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN | [2022/12] | English: | DOSING UNIT, WATER-BEARING HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE AND METHOD | [2022/12] | French: | UNITÉ DE DOSAGE, APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER À CIRCULATION D'EAU ET PROCÉDÉ | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 16.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2431490 (LAUER ELMA M); | [XA]WO02058528 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [XAI]US2005045652 (MASER BRYAN A [US]); | [XAYI]US2015359412 (DELGADO KRISTOPHER L [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2017166980 (QINGDAO HAIER DRUM WASHING MACHINE CO LTD [CN]) |