EP3959905 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A WIRELESS DATA CONNECTION BETWEEN A VEHICLE AND AN EXTERNAL UNIT, CONNECTION ESTABLISHMENT UNIT AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORSCH, Roland Ganghoferstr. 11 95469 Speichersdorf / DE | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20728994.3 | 18.05.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020EP63851 | Priority number, date | DE201910208515 | 12.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208515 | [2022/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249366 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959905 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/44, H04W4/42, H04W4/021, H04W48/02 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H04W4/021 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W24/08 (EP);
H04W4/42 (EP,US);
H04W4/44 (EP,US);
H04W48/04 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINER DRAHTLOSEN DATENVERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM FAHRZEUG UND EINER EXTERNEN EINHEIT, VERBINDUNGSAUFBAUEINHEIT UND FAHRZEUG | [2022/09] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A WIRELESS DATA CONNECTION BETWEEN A VEHICLE AND AN EXTERNAL UNIT, CONNECTION ESTABLISHMENT UNIT AND VEHICLE | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTABLIR UNE LIAISON DE DONNÉES SANS FIL ENTRE UN VÉHICULE ET UNE UNITÉ EXTÉRIEURE, UNITÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE LIAISON ET VÉHICULE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 22.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2015165682 (MCLAREN APPLIED TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7-15 * figures 2,3 * * page 1 - page 6 * * page 11 - page 24 * [A] 2-6; | [XY]DE102015107697 (GEN MOTORS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0050] * [Y] 4,6; | [YA]US2017215165 (TSENG FLING FINN [US], et al) [Y] 4,6 * figures 2,4-6 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0056] *[A] 1-3,5,7-15 |