EP3966219 - CONVERGENT LIQUID PHASE SYNTHESES OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Xianglin c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
KIESMAN, William, F. c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
ANTIA, Firoz c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
FILLON, Yannick c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
ZHOU, Xuan c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
YAN, Wuming c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
JIANG, Hong c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 08 /
NGUYEN, Hien c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 09 /
GRONKE, Robert, S. c/o Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 10 /
ICHIMARU, Taisuke c/o Research Institute For Bioscience Products Fine Chemicals AJINOMOTO Co., Inc. Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki, 210--8681 / JP | 11 /
HAMAGAKI, Takuya c/o Research Institute For Bioscience Products Fine Chemicals AJINOMOTO Co., Inc. Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki, 210--8681 / JP | 12 /
TAKAHASHI, Daisuke c/o Research Institute For Bioscience Products Fine Chemicals AJINOMOTO Co., Inc. Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki, 210--8681 / JP | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20729413.3 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US32070 | Priority number, date | US201962845160P | 08.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845160 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020227618 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3966219 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/00, C07H1/02, C07H21/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C07H1/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07H21/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07H1/02 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07H21/02 (CN,US);
C07H21/04 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | 06.12.2021 | ME | 06.12.2021 | Validation states | KH | 06.12.2021 | MA | 06.12.2021 | MD | 06.12.2021 | TN | 06.12.2021 | Title | German: | KONVERGENTE FLÜSSIGPHASENSYNTHESE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN | [2022/11] | English: | CONVERGENT LIQUID PHASE SYNTHESES OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | [2022/11] | French: | SYNTHÈSES EN PHASE LIQUIDE CONVERGENTE D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 06.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2022 | Observations by third parties | 14.09.2022 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0558749 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148; | [A]US2013267697 (HIRAI KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148; | [A]EP2711370 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148; | [A]EP2857412 (HOKKAIDO SYSTEM SCIENCE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148; | [A]US2018291056 (YAMASHITA KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148; | [A]EP3398955 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148; | [A] - SHOKAKU KIM ET AL, "Liquid-Phase RNA Synthesis by Using Alkyl-Chain-Soluble Support", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20130624), vol. 19, no. 26, doi:10.1002/chem.201300655, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 8615 - 8620, XP055211240 [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201300655 | [A] - CHIH-HAU CHEN ET AL, "Convergent Solution Phase Synthesis of Chimeric Oligonucleotides by a 2+2 and 3+3 Phosphoramidite Strategy", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, AU, (20100226), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.1071/CH09298, ISSN 0004-9425, pages 227 - 235, XP055648558 [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/CH09298 | [A] - G. M. BONORA ET AL, "A Liquid-Phase Process Suitable for Large-Scale Synthesis of Phosphorothioate Oligonucleotides", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, US, (20000501), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1021/op990096l, ISSN 1083-6160, pages 225 - 231, XP055399708 [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/op990096l | [A] - HERDERING WILHELM ET AL, "Phosphoramidites of Chiral (Rp)-and (Sp)-Configurated d(T[P-18O]-A): Synthesis, Configurational Assignment, and Use as Dimer Blocks in Oligonucleotide Synthesis", vol. 68, no. 8, doi:10.1002/HLCA.19850680805, ISSN 0018-019X, (19851218), pages 2119 - 2127, HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1002%2Fhlca.19850680805, (20041025), XP009504367 [A] 1-19,70-104,141-148 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19850680805 | by applicant | WO2007002390 | WO2010148249 | US8980853 | WO2015153800 | - Nat Biotechnol., (20170900), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 845 - 851 | - J. Org. Chem., (19990000), vol. 64, pages 7515 - 7522 | - Biopolymers (Peptide Science), (20010000), vol. 60, page 3 | - K.W. KNOUSEJ. N. DEGRUYTERM.A. SCHMIDT et al., Science, (20180000), vol. 361, no. 6408, pages 1234 - 1238 | other | US2013267697 | US2018291056 | EP3398955 | - Kierzek R., Ito H., Bhatt R., Itakura K., "Selective N-deacylation of N,O-protected nucleosides by zinc bromide", Tetrahedron Letters, Elsevier, Amsterdam , NL, Amsterdam , NL , (19810101), vol. 22, no. 38, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(01)82014-1, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3761 - 3764, XP055955636 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)82014-1 | - S. BERNARDINI et al., "58. Nucleosides and Nucleotides. Part 21. Synthesis of a Tridecanucleoside Dodecaphosphate Incorporating the Unnatural Base 2(1H)-Pyridone", Helvetica Chimica Acta, (19830000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/hlca.19830660226, pages 639 - 651, XP009051017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19830660226 |