EP3982812 - TRACTION SYSTEMS FOR ENDOSCOPIC PROCEDURES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEITZNER, Barry 3 MacLeod Lane Acton Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20729506.4 | 13.05.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US32579 | Priority number, date | US201962861555P | 14.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861555 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020251715 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982812 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A61B1/00087 (EP);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B1/00101 (EP);
A61B1/00137 (EP);
A61B1/0014 (EP);
A61B17/1227 (EP);
A61B2017/00292 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | TRAKTIONSSYSTEME FÜR ENDOSKOPISCHE VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/16] | English: | TRACTION SYSTEMS FOR ENDOSCOPIC PROCEDURES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/16] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE TRACTION POUR INTERVENTIONS ENDOSCOPIQUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 12.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005107809 (LITSCHER ERIC [US], et al); | [Y]EP1852073 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [XY]US2007270894 (ZIMMON DAVID S [US]); | [X]EP2120758 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [XY]US2017258460 (ZIMMON DAVID S [US]); | [Y]EP3257448 (COVIDIEN LP [US]); | [X]WO2018006044 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) | by applicant | US8062311 | US2018263614 | US2020129181 |