EP4143596 - UE POSITIONING AIDED BY RECONFIGURABLE REFLECTING SURFACES SUCH AS INTELLIGENT REFLECTING SURFACES (IRS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNA, Frederico 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
YOON, Daejung 91300 Massy / FR | 03 /
PARIS, Stefano 92170 Vanves / FR | 04 /
SCHAEPPERLE, Joerg 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 20729876.1 | 27.04.2020 | [2023/10] | WO2020US30087 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021221603 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143596 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00, G01S5/02, H04W64/00, H04W88/08 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G01S5/0218 (EP);
G01S5/0273 (EP,US);
G01S5/0036 (EP,US);
G01S5/0236 (EP);
G01S5/02521 (EP);
G01S5/0278 (EP);
H01Q1/241 (EP);
H01Q19/104 (EP,US);
H01Q3/46 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP);
G01S2205/007 (EP);
G01S2205/02 (EP,US);
G01S5/10 (EP);
H04B7/145 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄTEPOSITIONIERUNG MIT HILFE REKONFIGURIERBARER REFLEKTIERENDER OBERFLÄCHEN WIE INTELLIGENTE REFLEKTIERENDE OBERFLÄCHEN (IRS) | [2023/10] | English: | UE POSITIONING AIDED BY RECONFIGURABLE REFLECTING SURFACES SUCH AS INTELLIGENT REFLECTING SURFACES (IRS) | [2023/10] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT D'UE ASSISTÉ PAR DES SURFACES RÉFLÉCHISSANTES RECONFIGURABLES TELLES QUE DES SURFACES RÉFLÉCHISSANTES INTELLIGENTES (IRS) | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2020096506 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1,5-8,29-32,36-39,60 * figures 7-12 ** pages 11,29-38 *; | [XYI] - HENK WYMEERSCH ET AL, "Radio Localization and Mapping with Reconfigurable Intelligent Surfaces", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20191219), XP081569725 [X] 1,5,7,8,29,32,36,38,39,60 * figures 1, 3 * * abstract * * sections: Introduction Localization and Mapping with mmWave RIS Channel Estimation Signaling and System Architecture RIS Control Signal Design Localization and Mapping Algorithms * [Y] 2-4,33-35 [I] 6,30,31,37 | [Y] - GANTE JOAO ET AL, "Beamformed Fingerprint Learning for Accurate Millimeter Wave Positioning", 2018 IEEE 88TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC-FALL), IEEE, (20180827), doi:10.1109/VTCFALL.2018.8690987, pages 1 - 5, XP033535605 [Y] 2-4,33-35 * figures 1-2 * * sections: I. Introduction II. Proposed System Description * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTCFall.2018.8690987 | by applicant | - LIASKOS et al., "A new wireless communication paradigm through software-controlled metasurfaces", IEEE Communications Magazine, (20180000), vol. 56, no. 9, pages 162 - 169 | - C. GENTNER, "Multipath Assisted Positioning with Simultaneous Localization and Mapping", IEEE Transactions on Wireless Communications, (20160900), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TWC.2016.2578336, pages 6104 - 6117, XP011622594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2016.2578336 | - B. HU et al., "Simultaneous position and reflector estimation (SPRE) by single base-station", 2018 IEEE Wireless Communications and Networking Conference (WCNC, (20180000), doi:10.1109/WCNC.2018.8376984, pages 1 - 6, XP033354979 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2018.8376984 | - HUAWEIHISILICON, "On single-BS positioning technique", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Ad-Hoc Meeting 1901, (20190100), pages 21 - 25 | - MA, W.K.K., "Semidefinite relaxation of quadratic optimization problems and applications", IEEE Signal Processing Magazine, (20100000), vol. 1053, no. 5888/10 |