EP3984247 - MEMS TRANSDUCER HAVING A DIAPHRAGM MADE OF POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USound GmbH Kratkystrasse 2 8020 Graz / AT | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSCONI CLERICI BELTRAMI, Andrea Trauttmansdorffgasse 19/3 1130 Wien / AT | 02 /
BOTTONI, Ferruccio Muehlgasse 61 8020 Graz / AT | 03 /
RENAUD-BEZOT, Nick Einsiedlergasse 28/18 1050 Wien / AT | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20730622.6 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020EP65468 | Priority number, date | DE201910116080 | 13.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019116080 | [2022/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249457 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984247 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R17/00, H04R31/00, H04R7/04 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04R17/005 (EP,KR,US);
B81B3/007 (US);
B81C1/00658 (US);
H04R17/02 (US);
H04R31/003 (EP,KR,US);
H04R7/04 (EP,KR,US);
B81B2201/0257 (US);
B81B2203/0127 (US);
H04R2201/003 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | MEMS-SCHALLWANDLER MIT EINER AUS POLYMER AUSGEBILDETEN MEMBRAN | [2022/16] | English: | MEMS TRANSDUCER HAVING A DIAPHRAGM MADE OF POLYMER | [2022/16] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ACOUSTIQUE DE TYPE MEMS MUNI D'UNE MEMBRANE FORMÉE DE POLYMÈRE | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 13.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE60313715T (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [IA]JP2011077919 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [A]EP2362686 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]DE102017200111 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | by applicant | DE60313715T |