EP3984242 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ASSOCIATING A FIRST DEVICE WITH A SECOND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/51] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFRANCE, Serge c/o InterDigital R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 02 /
LELIEVRE, Sylvain c/o InterDigital R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 03 /
POREE, Corinne c/o InterDigital R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20730657.2 | 09.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020EP65987 | Priority number, date | EP20190305766 | 14.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19305766 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249568 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984242 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/4415, G06F21/31, G06F21/32, H04N21/258, H04N21/4223, H04N21/441, H04N21/475 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04N21/4415 (EP,US);
H04N21/25875 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP);
H04N21/4126 (EP);
H04N21/42201 (US);
H04N21/42203 (EP);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/4394 (EP);
H04N21/44008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES ERSTEN GERÄTS MIT EINEM ZWEITEN GERÄT | [2022/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ASSOCIATING A FIRST DEVICE WITH A SECOND DEVICE | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ASSOCIER UN PREMIER DISPOSITIF À UN SECOND DISPOSITIF | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 14.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009116703 (SCHULTZ PAUL T [US]); | [A]US2012297190 (SHEN GUOBIN [CN], et al); | [A]US2014259047 (BAKAR MAJD [US], et al); | [Y]US2017346851 (DRAKE CHRISTOPHER NATHAN TYRWHITT [AU]); | [Y]US2018146374 (GOLAN MEIR [IL], et al); | [Y]US2018218371 (WANG YICONG [US], et al); | [Y]US2018218139 (TUSSY KEVIN ALAN [US]); | [XY]WO2018170221 (CARRIER CORP [US]); | [A]US2019087832 (MERCURY MARK [US], et al) |