EP4003916 - SLUDGE DISPOSAL FOR WATERJET CUTTING MACHINES WITH A FILTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stahlkontor GmbH + Co. KG Preußerstraße 28 58135 Hagen / DE | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOCHT, Friedrich Emster Str. 15 58093 Hagen / DE | 02 /
LITSCHMANN, Roman Brunebeckweg 51 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20731007.9 | 29.05.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP65008 | Priority number, date | DE201910120192 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019120192 | [2022/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013411 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003916 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, B24C1/04, B24C9/00, C02F1/34, C02F103/16 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C02F1/004 (EP);
B24C9/006 (EP);
B24C1/045 (EP);
C02F1/34 (EP);
C02F2001/007 (EP);
C02F2103/16 (EP);
C02F2209/005 (EP);
C02F2301/028 (EP);
C02F2303/16 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | SCHLAMMENTSORGUNG BEI WASSERSTRAHLSCHNEIDMASCHINEN MIT EINEM FILTERSYSTEM | [2022/22] | English: | SLUDGE DISPOSAL FOR WATERJET CUTTING MACHINES WITH A FILTER SYSTEM | [2022/22] | French: | ÉLIMINATION DES BOUES PRÉSENTES DANS UNE MACHINE DE DÉCOUPE PAR JET D'EAU À L'AIDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 10.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE69204579T (GEC ALSTHOM ACB [FR]) [I] 1-6 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 3, line 28 - line 34 *; | [A]US5637029 (LEHANE WILLIAM B [CA]) [A] 1-6 * figure 3 * * column 4, line 28 - line 42 *; | [A]US6805618 (WARD VINCENT C [US], et al) [A] 6 * figure 5 *; | [A]US7775854 (BOMAN JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-6* figure 2 * | by applicant | DE19803967 |