EP3983632 - METHOD FOR TESTING A DOOR OPERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY Entrance Systems AB Box 131 261 22 Landskrona / SE | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖDERQVIST, Sven-Gunnar Bryggerivägen 56 253 41 Vallåkra / SE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20731041.8 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020EP65464 | Priority number, date | SE20190030191 | 13.06.2019 Original published format: SE 1930191 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249455 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983632 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/10, E05F15/63 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
E05F15/63 (EP,CN,US);
E05F1/105 (EP,CN,US);
E05Y2201/41 (EP,CN,US);
E05Y2201/422 (EP,CN,US);
E05Y2400/302 (EP,CN,US);
E05Y2400/336 (EP);
E05Y2400/337 (CN);
E05Y2400/458 (EP,CN);
E05Y2400/50 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN EINES TÜRBETÄTIGERS | [2022/16] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING A DOOR OPERATOR | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TEST D'UN OPÉRATEUR DE PORTE | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 04.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5956249 (BERAN MARK A [US], et al); | [A]WO2017200906 (SCHLAGE LOCK CO LLC [US]); | [XI]WO2019051404 (SCHLAGE LOCK CO LLC [US]) |