EP3976417 - DRIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUDZEN, Harald Triftweg 20 76829 Landau / DE | 02 /
SCHUHMACHER, Henrik Petergasse 8 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20731387.5 | 25.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP25242 | Priority number, date | DE20191003756 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019003756 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239260 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976417 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3976417 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60L7/10, H02M5/44, H02P3/22, H02M1/00, H02P27/06, H02M7/797, B60L50/40, B60L7/22 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
B60L7/22 (EP);
B60L50/40 (EP);
B60L7/10 (EP);
H02M5/44 (EP);
H02P3/22 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | B60L7/10, B60L7/22, B60L50/40, H02M7/797, H02P27/06, H02M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2022/14] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM | [2022/14] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 03.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN201504218U (PEI LIU) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XYI]JP6069151B (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 8 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0032] * [Y] 6-10 [I] 3,4,11-14; | [XYI]EP3156358 (FORWARD ELECTRONICS COMPANY LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10 [I] 3,11-13; | [XYI]US2017250538 (WANG CHANGYONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0055] * [Y] 6-10 [I] 3,4,11-14; | [Y] - Panduit, "Uninterruptible Power Supply (UPS) No Battery @BULLET Maintenance-Free @BULLET Remote Management", (20160922), URL: http://www.panduit.com/heiler/ProductBulletins/D-PUCB02--SA-ENG-UPSProductBulletin-W.pdf, (20200821), XP055724302 [Y] 6-10 * the whole document * | [A] - MSC ELECTRONICS OY ED - MSC ELECTRONICS OY, "SUPER CAPACITOR MODULE (SCM)", INTERNET CITATION, (20100408), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.msc.eu/msc_electronics/uploaded/files/Super_Capacitor_Module__SCM__Data_Sheet.pdf, (20110809), XP002656492 [A] 6-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US2003089557 | US6870279 | US2006020350 | JP2007151392 | US2007137945 | KR20080079081 | JP4772718B | IL169908 | US9270192 |