EP3970098 - OPTIMIZING RESERVE CREW PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal Express Corporation 3610 Hacks Cross Road Memphis, TN 38125 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ying 100 Keisie Cv Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, Richard 942 S. Shady Grove Road Memphis, Tennessee 38120 / US | 03 /
RANGAN, Suresh 2592 Berkley Lane Frisco, Texas 75034 / US | 04 /
JIN, Mingzhou 942 S. Shady Grove Road Memphis, Tennessee 38120 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20731649.8 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020US33240 | Priority number, date | US201962848374P | 15.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962848374 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020232396 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970098 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/30 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063116 (EP);
G06Q10/06312 (US);
G06F17/16 (US);
G06N7/01 (US);
G06Q10/04 (US);
G06Q10/06315 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERUNG VON RESERVEBESATZUNGSMUSTERN | [2022/12] | English: | OPTIMIZING RESERVE CREW PATTERNS | [2022/12] | French: | OPTIMISATION DE MODÈLES D'ÉQUIPAGE DE RÉSERVE | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 30.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2018101802 (FOX DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [I] - DAG WEDELIN ED - JAN VAN LEEUWEN, An algorithm for 0 1 programming with application to airline crew scheduling, ALGORITHMS ESA '94, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 319 - 330, (19940926), ISBN 978-3-540-58434-6, XP047005564 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * | [I] - CRAWFORD BRODERICK ET AL, Constructive Metaheuristics for the Set Covering Problem, PERVASIVE: INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PERVASIVE COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 88 - 99, (20180512), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047473071 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-91641-5_8 | [I] - KARADAG A A ET AL, "A hybrid approach of heuristic and exact method for crew pairing problem", COMPUTERS AND INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING (CIE), 2010 40TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100725), ISBN 978-1-4244-7295-6, pages 1 - 6, XP031835926 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * | [I] - BAKER E ET AL, "Computational results for very large air crew scheduling problems", OMEGA, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0305-0483(81)90049-9, ISSN 0305-0483, (19810101), pages 613 - 618, (20030523), XP009521419 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-0483(81)90049-9 | [I] - WEDELIN D ED - VAN LEEUWEN J, "An algorithm for 0-1 programming with application to airline crew scheduling", ALGORITHMS - ESA '94. PROCEEDINGS OF 2ND ANNUAL EUROPEAN SYMPOSIUM ON ALGORITHMS; 26-28 SEPT. 1994; UTRECHT, NETHERLANDS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, GERMANY, doi:10.1007/BFB0049419, ISBN 978-3-540-58434-6, (19940101), pages 319 - 330, (20060223), XP009521420 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BFb0049419 | [I] - KIWIEL K C ET AL, "Bregman proximal relaxation of large-scale 0-1 problems", COMPUTATIONAL OPTIMIZATION AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER US, BOSTON, (19991231), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1023/A:1008770914218, ISSN 0926-6003, pages 33 - 44, XP009521421 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008770914218 | [I] - CAPRARA A ET AL, "Algorithms for the set covering problem", ANNALS OF OPERATIONS RESEARCH, J.C. BALTZER A.G. SCIENTIFIC PUBL. CO, CH, (20001201), vol. 98, no. 4, doi:10.1023/A:1019225027893, ISSN 0254-5330, pages 353 - 371, XP009521422 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019225027893 | [I] - MARCHIORI E ET AL, "An evolutionary algorithm for large scale set covering problems with application to airline crew scheduling", REAL-WORLD APPLICATIONS OF EVOLUTIONARY COMPUTING : EVOWORKSHOPS 2000, APR. 17, 2000 ; PROCEEDINGS; EVOIASP, EVOSCONDI, EVOTEL, EVOSTIM, EVOROB, AND EVOFLIGHT, EDINBURGH, SCOTLAND, UK; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE (INCLUDING SUBSERIES LECTURE N, vol. 1803, doi:10.1007/3-540-45561-2_36, ISBN 978-3-540-67353-8, (20000101), pages 367 - 381, (20030211), XP009521423 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45561-2_36 | [I] - KARADAG A A ET AL, "A hybrid approach of heuristic and exact method for crew pairing problem", COMPUTERS AND INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING (CIE), 2010 40TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1109/ICCIE.2010.5668367, ISBN 978-1-4244-7295-6, page 6pp, XP009521433 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCIE.2010.5668367 | [I] - RUBIN J, "A technique for the solution of massive set covering problems, with application to airline crew scheduling", TRANSPORTATION SCIENCE, OPERATIONS RESEARCH SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19730131), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 0041-1655, pages 34 - 48, XP009521434 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1287/trsc.7.1.34 | [I] - CHRISTOFIDES N DEPT OF MANAGE SCI ET AL, "Algorithms for large scale set covering problems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPTIMIZATION: TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS - ICOTA 1987, 8-10 APRIL 1987 SINGAPORE, NAT. UNIV. SINGAPORE, SINGAPORE, (19870101), pages 2 - 35, XP009521431 [I] 1-20 * the whole document * |