EP3941542 - INJECTABLE AQUEOUS IMPLANT FORMULATION CONTAINING ASCORBIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geistlich Pharma AG Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUPPIGER, Daniel Lindenmatt 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | 02 /
BUXTON, Paul Schädrütihalde 14 6006 Luzern / CH | 03 /
KURZ, Nino Oberfeldstrasse 5 3550 Langnau im Emmental / CH | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
SUPPIGER, Daniel 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | ||
02 /
BUXTON, Paul 6006 Luzern / CH | |||
03 /
KURZ, Nino 3550 Langnau im Emmental / CH | Representative(s) | Savatier, Yves Geistlich Pharma AG Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20731868.4 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP66267 | Priority number, date | EP20190180283 | 14.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19180283 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249711 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941542 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3941542 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/32, A61L2/00, A61L27/12, A61L27/24, A61L27/50, A61L27/54, A61K38/01, A61K9/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61L27/24 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L27/54 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L27/12 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K9/0024 (EP,CN,US);
A61C19/06 (CN);
A61K31/375 (CN,US);
A61K33/06 (CN,US);
A61K35/32 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K38/014 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K47/42 (US);
A61L2/0035 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L2/0041 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L27/46 (KR);
A61L27/50 (EP,CN);
A61M5/2066 (US);
A61M5/28 (KR);
A61L2202/21 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L2300/21 (EP);
A61L2300/428 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L2400/06 (EP,CN,KR);
A61L2400/12 (EP,CN,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K35/32, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/014, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN) |
Former IPC [2022/04] | A61L27/12, A61L27/24, A61L27/50, A61L27/54, A61K38/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INJIZIERBARE WÄSSRIGE IMPLANTATFORMULIERUNG MIT ASCORBINSÄURE | [2022/04] | English: | INJECTABLE AQUEOUS IMPLANT FORMULATION CONTAINING ASCORBIC ACID | [2022/04] | French: | FORMULATION INJECTABLE D'IMPLANT AQUEUX CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE | [2022/14] |
Former [2022/04] | FORMULATION D'IMPLANT AQUEUSE INJECTABLE CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 21.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | IE | 12.06.2023 | LU | 12.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4246457 (TEICHERT ALLEN L, et al); | [Y]US2011091353 (BURGESS WILSON [US], et al); | [Y]EP3323437 (WARSAW ORTHOPEDIC INC [US]) | by applicant | EP0270254 | US5167961 | US5352715 | US5417975 | US7322825 | US2012107401 | EP1676592 | EP2654816 | EP2654815 | WO2019115795 |