Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022230550 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US34585 | 26.05.2020 | US201962857225 | 04.06.2019 | US202017615779 | 26.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220031574 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US34585 | 26.05.2020 | US201962857225 | 04.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114127510 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US34585 | 26.05.2020 | US201962857225 | 04.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020288125 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US34585 | 26.05.2020 | US201962857225 | 04.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3980717 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US34585 | 26.05.2020 | US201962857225 | 04.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020247212 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962857225 | 04.06.2019 |