EP3982777 - SENSOR MODULE FOR DETERMINING AN AEROSOL DOSE RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/16] | SENSOR MODULE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN AEROSOL DOSE RATE | ||
[2022/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOHLFELD, Jens Seckbruchstrasse 65 30629 Hannover / DE | 02 /
POHLMANN, Gerhard Am Gallweg 14 31715 Meerbeck / DE | 03 /
HOLZ, Olaf Poggfreedweg 45 22149 Hamburg / DE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20732598.6 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020EP66609 | Priority number, date | EP20190180566 | 17.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19180566 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254313 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982777 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3982777 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, G01F1/36, G01F1/42, G01F1/74, G01F15/06 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G01F1/42 (EP,US);
G01F1/74 (EP,US);
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/0083 (US);
G01F1/363 (EP);
G01F15/066 (EP);
G01N21/534 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3313 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
G01F1/46 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | A24F47/00, A61M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORMODUL ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER AEROSOLDOSISRATE | [2022/51] | English: | SENSOR MODULE FOR DETERMINING AN AEROSOL DOSE RATE | [2022/51] | French: | MODULE DE CAPTEUR POUR DÉTERMINER UN TAUX DE DOSAGE D'AÉROSOL | [2022/51] |
Former [2022/16] | SENSORMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER AEROSOLDOSISRATE | ||
Former [2022/16] | SENSOR MODULE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN AEROSOL DOSE RATE | ||
Former [2022/16] | MODULE DE CAPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN DÉBIT DE DOSE D'AÉROSOL | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 08.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 16.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4370986 (GEBHART JOSEF [DE], et al); | [A]US5887586 (DAHLBAECK MAGNUS [SE], et al); | [A]WO2019014373 (UNIV ARIZONA STATE [US]); | by applicant | US4370986 | US5887586 | US2017290527 | US2017340844 | WO2019014373 |