EP3969350 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A VIDEO MONITORING SYSTEM FOR A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Thorsten Wiesenweg 33 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20732751.1 | 27.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP64637 | Priority number, date | DE201910208770 | 17.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208770 | [2022/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254076 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969350 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B61L15/00, H04L12/721, H04L12/751, H04W40/24 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
B61L15/0027 (EP);
G06V20/56 (US);
B61L15/0036 (EP);
B61L15/0072 (EP);
B61L15/0081 (EP);
B61L23/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES VIDEOÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2022/12] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A VIDEO MONITORING SYSTEM FOR A RAIL VEHICLE | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE VIDÉO POUR UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 30.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013058253 (MARUTA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,9,10 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1A,8,9 ** paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0115] *; | [Y]EP2571265 (RAIL & ROAD PROTEC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y] - GO SHARLEEN JOY ET AL, "An SDN-based Framework for Improving the Performance of Underprovisioned IP Video Surveillance Networks", 2018 15TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERVASIVE SYSTEMS, ALGORITHMS AND NETWORKS (I-SPAN), IEEE, (20181016), doi:10.1109/I-SPAN.2018.00033, pages 154 - 161, XP033514470 [Y] 1-10 * I. Introduction; page 154 * * II. System Overview; page 155 - page 156; figure 1 * * III. Controller Intervention Mechanisms; page 156 * * V. Proposed Solution; page 157 - page 159 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/I-SPAN.2018.00033 | [A] - MOHAMMADI REZA ET AL, "An adaptive type-2 fuzzy traffic engineering method for video surveillance systems over software defined networks", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, vol. 76, no. 22, doi:10.1007/S11042-016-4137-0, ISSN 1380-7501, (20161122), pages 23627 - 23642, (20161122), XP036349495 [A] 8 * 4. Problem Formulation * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-016-4137-0 |