EP3991050 - MICROCONTROLLER SYSTEM WITH GPIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORE, Anders c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
BARZIC, Ronan c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | 03 /
FAGERHEIM, Fredrik Jacobsen c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/18] | 01 /
NORE, Anders c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | ||
02 /
BARZIC, Ronan c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | |||
03 /
FAGERHEIM, Fredrik Jacobsen c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20732992.1 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020EP67243 | Priority number, date | GB20190009270 | 27.06.2019 Original published format: GB 201909270 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020260171 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991050 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3991050 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/40 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
G06F13/385 (EP,US);
G06F13/20 (US);
G06F13/4068 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM MIT GPIOS | [2022/18] | English: | MICROCONTROLLER SYSTEM WITH GPIOS | [2022/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MICROCONTRÔLEUR AVEC GPIO | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 26.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2509001 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US2013080677 (SIMMONS MICHAEL [US]); | [I]EP2713317 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) | Examination | EP2509001 |