EP3984126 - RECTIFIER FOR MILLIMETRE-WAVE AC VOLTAGE SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARUTYUNYAN, Armen c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20733249.5 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020EP66337 | Priority number, date | DE201910208582 | 13.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208582 | [2022/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249753 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984126 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/217, H02J50/20, G06K19/07, H02M7/25 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H02J50/20 (EP);
H02M7/217 (EP,US);
G06K19/0708 (EP);
G06K19/0715 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (US);
H02M7/25 (EP);
G06K19/0713 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | GLEICHRICHTER FÜR MILLIMETER-WELLEN-WECHSELSPANNUNGSSIGNALE | [2022/16] | English: | RECTIFIER FOR MILLIMETRE-WAVE AC VOLTAGE SIGNALS | [2022/16] | French: | REDRESSEUR POUR SIGNAUX DE TENSION ALTERNATIVE À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 11.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE102008049648 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 16]; figures 2A, 3B * [A] 8[I] 2-4,7 | by applicant | EP3133533 |