EP3966391 - SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED FIBER PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/11] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING MOLDED FIBER PRODUCTS | ||
[2023/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Congruens Group, LLC 618 Walnut Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Zume, Inc. 151 Factory Stores Dr. Camarillo, California 93010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONTRAGER, Rick c/o Zume, Inc. 151 Factory Stores Dr. Camarillo, California 93010 / US | 02 /
GONZALEZ, Pablo c/o Zume Inc. 151 Factory Stores Dr. Camarillo, California 93010 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20733504.3 | 06.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US31675 | Priority number, date | US201962844044P | 06.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962844044 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227409 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966391 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3966391 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D21J3/00, D21J7/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
D21J7/00 (EP);
B29C41/16 (US);
B29C31/00 (US);
B29C37/02 (US);
B29C41/42 (US);
B29C43/02 (US);
B29C43/56 (US);
D21J3/00 (EP,US);
B29C2043/561 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | D21J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GEFORMTER FASERPRODUKTE | [2022/11] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED FIBER PRODUCTS | [2023/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS DE FIBRE MOULÉE | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/11] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING MOLDED FIBER PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2022/11] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS DE FIBRE MOULÉE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 01.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03044279 (GRENIDEA TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [X]EP2937462 (EURASIA EP MACHINERY CO LTD [CN], et al); | [AD]CN107915044 (ZHEJIANG SHURCON TECH CO LTD) |