EP3986145 - USE OF ST GAL(+) BACTERIA FOR PRODUCING A FERMENTED MILK PRODUCT WITH A RELATIVELY HIGH STABLE PH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANZEN, Thomas c/o Chr. Hansen A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | 02 /
CHRISTIANSEN, Ditte Ellegaard c/o Chr. Hansen A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20733621.5 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020EP67150 | Priority number, date | EP20190181466 | 20.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19181466 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254604 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986145 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/123, C12N1/00, C12R1/46, A23C19/032 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A23C9/1238 (EP,US);
A23C19/0323 (EP);
C12N1/20 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N15/01 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ST GAL(+)-BAKTERIEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FERMENTIERTEN MILCHPRODUKTS MIT EINEM RELATIV HOHEN STABILEN PH-WERT | [2022/17] | English: | USE OF ST GAL(+) BACTERIA FOR PRODUCING A FERMENTED MILK PRODUCT WITH A RELATIVELY HIGH STABLE PH | [2022/17] | French: | UTILISATION DE BACTÉRIES ST GAL(+) POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT LAITIER FERMENTÉ AYANT UN PH STABLE RELATIVEMENT ÉLEVÉ | [2022/17] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 20.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017135360 (GARRIGUES CHRISTEL [DK], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0342] * * example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2018130630 (CHR HANSEN AS [DK]) [I] 1-17 * page 1, line 5 * * page 1, line 29 - page 23, line 2 * * example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2018177835 (CHR HANSEN AS [DK]) [I] 1-17 * page 1, lines 6-14 * * page 2, line 5 - page 27, line 5 * * example -; claim - *; | [I] - PATRICK MF DERKX ET AL, "The art of strain improvement of industrial lactic acid bacteria without the use of recombinant DNA technology", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES,, (20140829), vol. 13, no. Suppl 1, doi:10.1186/1475-2859-13-S1-S5, ISSN 1475-2859, page S5, XP021193168 [I] 1-17 * page 8 - page 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-13-S1-S5 | [A] - Anonymus, "Cheese Culture Catalogue DVS ? Product Range", (20140101), URL: http://www.hjemmeriet.dk/ChrHansen/Brochures/GlobalCheeseCultureCatalogue_EN-2014.pdf, (20160923), XP055305220 [A] 1-17 * DVS(R) ST-B/SSC; page 27 * | [A] - K ANBUKKARASI ET AL, "Production of low browning Mozzarella cheese: Screening and characterization of wild galactose fermenting Streptococcus thermophilus strains", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED RESEARCH, (20130701), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 83 - 96, XP055429346 [A] 1-17 * page 84, column r, paragraph l - page 93, column r, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | WO2011026863 | WO2011092300 | WO2013160413 | EP2957180 | WO2019042881 | - ANBUKKARASI et al., J Food Sci Technol, (20140900), vol. 51, no. 9, pages 2183 - 2189 | - ANBUKKARASI et al., "Production of low browning Mozzarella cheese: Screening and characterization of wild galactose fermenting Streptococcus thermophilus strains", International Journal of advanced research, (20130000), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 83 - 96, XP055429346 | - DERKX et al., "The art of strain improvement of industrial lactic acid bacteria without the use of recombinant DNA technology", Microbial Cell Factories, (20140000), vol. 13, no. 1 | - YOFLEX® ACIDIFIX®, Chr. Hansen A/S |